Overhead Solutions, Inc. v. A1 Garage Door Service, L.L.C.
Plaintiff: Overhead Solutions, Inc.
Defendant: A1 Garage Door Service LLC and A1 Garage Door Service, L.L.C.
Case Number: 1:2019cv01741
Filed: June 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Philip A Brimmer
Referring Judge: Nina Y Wang
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 15:44
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 9, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Shirin Chahal on behalf of Overhead Solutions, Inc.Attorney Shirin Chahal added to party Overhead Solutions, Inc.(pty:pla) (Chahal, Shirin)
August 9, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Melissa Paige Orgel on behalf of Overhead Solutions, Inc.Attorney Melissa Paige Orgel added to party Overhead Solutions, Inc.(pty:pla) (Orgel, Melissa)
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER SETTING RULE 16(b) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 8/7/2019. A Scheduling Conference is set for 9/24/2019 10:00 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. The parties shall submit their proposed scheduling order, including a copy of the proposed order in Word format sent via email to Wang_Chambers@cod.uscourts.gov, seven days prior to the Scheduling Conference. (bwilk, )
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang for non-dispositive matters. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, and (4) conduct a pretrial conference and enter a pretrial order. Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, this court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. By Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 7/31/19. Text Only Entry (pabsec)
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 7/30/2019, re: Second Order to Show Cause [Docket No. 9] is hereby DISCHARGED. ORDERED that, insofar as plaintiff requests that the Court enter a temporary restraining order, plaintiff's Verified Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction, with Supporting Brief #2 is DENIED. ORDERED that, to the extent that plaintiff moves for a preliminary injunction, plaintiff's Verified Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction, with Supporting Brief #2 is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE.(sphil, )
July 9, 2019 Filing 12 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re #9 by Plaintiff Overhead Solutions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit)(Goodwin, Daniel)
July 9, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE re #9 Order to Show Cause, Allegation of Diversity by Plaintiff Overhead Solutions, Inc. (Goodwin, Daniel)
July 2, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Overhead Solutions, Inc.. A1 Garage Door Service, L.L.C. served on 7/2/2019, answer due 7/23/2019. (Goodwin, Daniel)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SECOND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 7/1/2019. ORDERED that, on or before July 9, 2019, plaintiff shall show cause why this case should not be dismissed due to the Court's lack of subject matter jurisdiction. (sphil, ) Modified on 7/2/2019 to edit text. (sphil, ).
June 24, 2019 Filing 8 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re #7 by Plaintiff Overhead Solutions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit)(Goodwin, Daniel)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 6/17/2019. ORDERED that, on or before June 27, 2019, plaintiff shall show cause why this case should not be dismissed due to the Court's lack of subject matter jurisdiction. (sphil, )
June 14, 2019 Filing 6 Report re Patent/Trademark: Report on the filing of an action emailed (NEF) to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (rroge, )
June 14, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (rroge, )
June 14, 2019 Filing 4 Case assigned to Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer and drawn to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Text Only Entry. (rroge, )
June 14, 2019 Filing 3 BRIEF in Support of #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Plaintiff Overhead Solutions, Inc.. (Goodwin, Daniel)
June 14, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiff Overhead Solutions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Goodwin, Daniel)
June 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against A1 Garage Door Service LLC (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6744366)Attorney Daniel Thomas Goodwin added to party Overhead Solutions, Inc.(pty:pla), filed by Overhead Solutions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Summons, #6 Affidavit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit)(Goodwin, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Overhead Solutions, Inc. v. A1 Garage Door Service, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A1 Garage Door Service LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A1 Garage Door Service, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Overhead Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel Thomas Goodwin
Represented By: Shirin Chahal
Represented By: Melissa Paige Orgel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?