Detlef v. Colorado Spring's Police Department et al
Plaintiff: Siearra Detlef
Defendant: El Paso Sheriff Department, Colorado Spring's Police Department and Criminal Justice Center
Case Number: 1:2019cv01761
Filed: June 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Gordon P Gallagher
Nature of Suit: Prisoner - Civil Rights (U.S. not a defendant)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 29, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE re: payment by Plaintiff Siearra Detlef (sphil, )
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Directing Plaintiff to Cure Deficiencies. If Plaintiff fails to cure all of the designated deficiencies within thirty (30) days from the date of this Order, the action will be dismissed without further notice. The dismissal shall be without prejudice, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 7/25/2019. (sphil, )
July 17, 2019 Filing 7 Prisoner's Motion and Affidavit for Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915 by Plaintiff Siearra Detlef. (sphil, )
June 19, 2019 Filing 6 LETTER by Plaintiff Siearra Detlef. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(angar, )
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Directing Plaintiff to Cure Deficiencies. If Plaintiff fails to cure all of the designated deficiencies within thirty (30) days from the date of this Order, the action will be dismissed without further notice. The dismissal shall be without prejudice, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 6/19/2019. ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court mail to Plaintiff, together with a copy of this order, a blank copy of the following form: Prisoner's Motion and Affidavit for Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915. (forms mailed as ordered). (sphil, )
June 17, 2019 Filing 4 Prisoner's Motion and Affidavit for Leave to Proceed on Appeal Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915 and FED.R.APP.P.24 in a Criminal Case by Plaintiff Siearra Detlef. (rsams, )
June 17, 2019 Filing 3 Prisoner's Motion and Affidavit for Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915 by Plaintiff Siearra Detlef. (Attachments: #1 Attachment) (rsams, ). Modified on 6/23/2019 to correct docket entry (rsams, ).
June 17, 2019 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher. Text Only Entry. (rsams, )
June 17, 2019 Filing 1 Prisoner COMPLAINT against Colorado Spring's Police Department, Criminal Justice Center, El Paso Sheriff Department, filed by Siearra Detlef. (Attachments: #1 Attachment, #2 Envelope)(rsams, ). Modified on 6/23/2019 to correct docket entry (rsams, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Detlef v. Colorado Spring's Police Department et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Siearra Detlef
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: El Paso Sheriff Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colorado Spring's Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Criminal Justice Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?