Colorado Sky Industrial Supply, LLC v. Easy Street Services Company et al

Plaintiff: Colorado Sky Industrial Supply, LLC
Defendant: Donion, Paul M. Donion and J&J Empire LLC
3Rd Party Plaintiff: Meghan Rodriguez, Rodriguez and Easy Street Services Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv01774
Filed: June 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Kathleen M Tafoya
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 16, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim First Count of Counterclaim by Plaintiff Colorado Sky Industrial Supply, LLC, Counter Defendant Colorado Sky Industrial Supply, LLC. (Rosales, Daniel)
August 16, 2019 Filing 18 Plaintiff's ANSWER/REPLY to #14 Answer to Complaint,, Third Party Complaint,, Crossclaim,, Counterclaim, by Colorado Sky Industrial Supply, LLC.(Rosales, Daniel)
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 AMENDED ORDER SETTING Scheduling Conference for 9/16/2019 10:30 AM in Courtroom 101 (Colorado Springs) before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 08/08/2019. (ksena)
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MINUTE ORDER granting #15 Motion to Continue Scheduling/Planning Conference and Related Deadlines. The Scheduling Conference set for August 19, 2019, is vacated, to be reset by separate order. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 8/8/19. Text Only Entry(kmtlc1 )
August 8, 2019 Filing 15 Unopposed MOTION to Continue Scheduling/Planning Conference and Related Deadlines by Plaintiff Colorado Sky Industrial Supply, LLC, Counter Defendant Colorado Sky Industrial Supply, LLC. (Rosales, Daniel)
July 26, 2019 Filing 14 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, Attorney Michael J. Davis added to party Rodriguez(pty:dft), THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against J&J Empire LLC Attorney Michael J. Davis added to party Rodriguez(pty:dft), CROSSCLAIM against Paul M. Donion, COUNTERCLAIM against Colorado Sky Industrial Supply, LLC by Rodriguez, Meghan Rodriguez, Easy Street Services Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Release of all claims)(Davis, Michael)
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MINUTE ORDER granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond. Easy Street Services Company answer due 7/26/2019; Meghan Rodriguez answer due 7/26/2019. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 7/12/19. Text Only Entry(kmtlc1 )
July 12, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #1 Complaint, by Defendants Easy Street Services Company, Meghan Rodriguez. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Davis, Michael)
July 12, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Michael J. Davis on behalf of Easy Street Services Company, Meghan RodriguezAttorney Michael J. Davis added to party Easy Street Services Company(pty:dft), Attorney Michael J. Davis added to party Meghan Rodriguez(pty:dft) (Davis, Michael)
July 11, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Colorado Sky Industrial Supply, LLC. Meghan Rodriguez served on 7/10/2019, answer due 7/31/2019. (Rosales, Daniel)
July 8, 2019 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Colorado Sky Industrial Supply, LLC. Paul M. Donion waiver sent on 7/3/2019, answer due 9/3/2019. (Rosales, Daniel)
June 27, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Colorado Sky Industrial Supply, LLC. Easy Street Services Company served on 6/21/2019, answer due 7/12/2019. (Rosales, Daniel)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 8/19/2019 09:45 AM in Courtroom 101 (Colorado Springs) before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Consent Form due by 8/12/2019. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 06/21/2019. (ksena)
June 20, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Brett Adam Berman on behalf of Colorado Sky Industrial Supply, LLCAttorney Brett Adam Berman added to party Colorado Sky Industrial Supply, LLC(pty:pla) (Berman, Brett)
June 19, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (rroge, )
June 19, 2019 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Text Only Entry. (rroge, )
June 19, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE Civil Case Cover Sheet by Plaintiff Colorado Sky Industrial Supply, LLC (Rosales, Daniel)
June 19, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Easy Street Services Company; Meghan Rodriguez; Paul M. Donion re #1 Complaint, by Plaintiff Colorado Sky Industrial Supply, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons (Meghan Rodriguez), #2 Summons (Paul M. Donion))(Rosales, Daniel)
June 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6750617)Attorney Daniel M. Rosales, Jr added to party Colorado Sky Industrial Supply, LLC(pty:pla), filed by Colorado Sky Industrial Supply, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Rosales, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Colorado Sky Industrial Supply, LLC v. Easy Street Services Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul M. Donion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J&J Empire LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Meghan Rodriguez
Represented By: Michael J. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Rodriguez
Represented By: Michael J. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Easy Street Services Company
Represented By: Michael J. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Colorado Sky Industrial Supply, LLC
Represented By: Daniel M. Rosales, Jr.
Represented By: Brett Adam Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?