Rodriguez v. OSR Consulting, LLC
Plaintiff: Simon E. Rodriguez
Defendant: OSR Consulting, LLC
Interested Party: United States Bankruptcy Court for the District of Colorado
In Re: Weston Educational, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv01793
Filed: June 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Robert E Blackburn
Referring Judge: S Kato Crews
2 Judge: William J Martinez
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Withdrawal
Cause of Action: 28:157b
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: Before the Court is Defendant's Motion to Withdraw the Reference #1 . The parties agree that the reference should be withdrawn, but also that the Bankruptcy Court should continue to conduct these proceedings through the pretrial phase. Accordingly, the motion is GRANTED and the reference to the Bankruptcy Court is WITHDRAWN. However, the Bankruptcy Court is DESIGNATED to conduct all pretrial proceedings, including resolution of dispositive motions and holding the final pretrial conference. The undersigned will thereafter preside over the final trial preparation conference and trial, and resolve any post-trial motions. SO ORDERED by Judge William J. Martinez on 07/15/2019. Text Only Entry (wjmlc1)
July 10, 2019 Filing 11 REPLY to Response to #1 MOTION to Withdraw Reference filed by Defendant OSR Consulting, LLC. (Jones, Roland)
July 8, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Roland Gary Jones on behalf of OSR Consulting, LLCAttorney Roland Gary Jones added to party OSR Consulting, LLC(pty:dft) (Jones, Roland)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: Before the Court is Defendant's Motion to Withdraw the Reference #1 . No later than July 10, 2019, Defendant shall reply regarding Plaintiff's proposal "that all pretrial proceedings be conducted by the bankruptcy court, including resolution of dispositive motions, with the District Court conducting the pretrial conference, the trial, and all post-trial matters." SO ORDERED by Judge William J. Martinez on 07/01/2019. Text Only Entry (wjmlc1)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: Counsel for the parties and all counsel who may later enter an appearance shall review and familiarize themselves with the undersigned's Revised Practice Standards (as most recently revised effective December 1, 2018 and as they may be amended from time to time), which may be downloaded #here. SO ORDERED by Judge William J. Martinez on 6/ 21/2019. Text Only Entry (wjmsec, )
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. Magistrate Judge Crews, or such other Magistrate Judge who may in the future be reassigned this case, is designated to conduct NDISPO proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 72(a) and (b). Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the Magistrate Judge or on the request of the parties by motion, the court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. SO ORDERED by Judge William J. Martinez on 6/21/2019. Text Only Entry (wjmsec, )
June 21, 2019 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE by Senior Judge Blackburn. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge William J. Martinez. All future pleadings should be designated as 19-cv-01793-WJM. (athom, )
June 20, 2019 Filing 5 Case assigned to Judge Robert E. Blackburn and drawn to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. Text Only Entry (cmadr, )
June 20, 2019 Filing 4 Clerk's NOTICE of Referral of #1 MOTION to Withdraw Reference. (cmadr, )
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Transmitting the Motion for Withdrawal of Reference to the U.S. District Court for further action by United States Bankruptcy Court Judge Joseph G. Rosania, Jr. on 19 June, 2019. (cmadr, )
June 20, 2019 Filing 2 Plaintiff's RESPONSE to #1 MOTION to Withdraw the Reference filed by Plaintiff Simon E. Rodriguez. (cmadr, )
June 20, 2019 Filing 1 Defendant's MOTION to Withdraw the Reference by Defendant OSR Consulting, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Docket Sheet)(cmadr, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rodriguez v. OSR Consulting, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: United States Bankruptcy Court for the District of Colorado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: Weston Educational, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Simon E. Rodriguez
Represented By: Lacey S. Bryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OSR Consulting, LLC
Represented By: Douglas D. Koktavy
Represented By: Roland Gary Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?