France et al v. Trans States Airlines, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Emily France, O F and Emily (I) France
Defendant: Trans States Airlines, LLC and United Airlines Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv01795
Filed: June 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: N Reid Neureiter
Nature of Suit: Airplane
Cause of Action: 28:1332pa
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 18, 2019 Filing 20 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Emily France, Emily (I) France.(Bolson, Anthony)
August 17, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE OF CONSENT by Defendants Trans States Airlines, LLC, United Airlines Inc. (Maye, Brian)
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MINUTE ORDER granting #17 Joint Motion to Extend Briefing Deadlines Regarding Motion to Dismiss and Motion to Strike, by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 7/26/2019.(tsher, )
July 26, 2019 Filing 17 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond , Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #11 MOTION to Dismiss , #14 MOTION to Dismiss by Plaintiffs Emily France, Emily (I) France. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Bolson, Anthony)
July 26, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Michael G. McQuillen on behalf of Trans States Airlines, LLC, United Airlines Inc.Attorney Michael G. McQuillen added to party Trans States Airlines, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Michael G. McQuillen added to party United Airlines Inc.(pty:dft) (McQuillen, Michael)
July 17, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by David Harley Carriger on behalf of Emily France, Emily (I) France Attorney David Harley Carriger added to party Emily France(pty:pla), Attorney David Harley Carriger added to party Emily (I) France (pty:pla) (Carriger, David)
July 15, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant United Airlines Inc.. (Maye, Brian)
July 15, 2019 Filing 13 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Maye, Brian)
July 15, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by United Airlines Inc..(Maye, Brian)
July 15, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant Trans States Airlines, LLC. (Maye, Brian)
July 15, 2019 Filing 10 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Maye, Brian)
July 15, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Trans States Airlines, LLC.(Maye, Brian)
July 15, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Brian Timothy Maye on behalf of Trans States Airlines, LLC, United Airlines Inc.Attorney Brian Timothy Maye added to party Trans States Airlines, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Brian Timothy Maye added to party United Airlines Inc.(pty:dft) (Maye, Brian)
June 25, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. United Airlines Inc. served on 6/24/2019, answer due 7/15/2019. (Bolson, Anthony)
June 25, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Trans States Airlines, LLC served on 6/24/2019, answer due 7/15/2019. (Bolson, Anthony)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 6/21/2019. Consent Form due by August 28, 2019. Scheduling/Planning Conference set for September 12, 2019 10:30 AM in Courtroom C205 before Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. (agarc, )
June 21, 2019 Filing 4 ADVISORY NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: L. Dante diTrapano attempted to enter his appearance in this case by affixing his "s/ " signature to the complaint. Counsel is a not a member of the bar this court. Pursuant to D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a)(5) his purported appearance will not be recognized. (Text Only Entry) (mfred)
June 20, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (rroge, )
June 20, 2019 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. Text Only Entry. (rroge, )
June 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6753835)Attorney Anthony Bolson added to party O F(pty:pla), Attorney Anthony Bolson added to party Emily France(pty:pla), filed by Emily France, O F. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet)(Bolson, Anthony)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: France et al v. Trans States Airlines, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emily France
Represented By: Anthony Bolson
Represented By: David Harley Carriger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: O F
Represented By: Anthony Bolson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emily (I) France
Represented By: Anthony Bolson
Represented By: David Harley Carriger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trans States Airlines, LLC
Represented By: Michael G. McQuillen
Represented By: Brian Timothy Maye
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Airlines Inc.
Represented By: Michael G. McQuillen
Represented By: Brian Timothy Maye
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?