Brennan v. BioScrip, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Lila Brennan
Defendant: Michael G. Bronfein, David W. Golding, Christopher S. Shackelton, BioScrip, Inc., Daniel E. Greenleaf, R. Carter Pate, Steven Neumann and Michael S. Goldstein
Case Number: 1:2019cv01865
Filed: June 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Nina Y Wang
Nature of Suit: Securities, Commodities, Exchange
Cause of Action: 15:78
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Motion to Continue by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 8/23/2019. The Status Conference set for 8/29/2019 is VACATED and RESET for 10/2/2019 09:30 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Furthermore, the Consent Form is now by 9/25/2019. NO FURTHER EXTENSIONS WILL BE GRANTED ABSENT EXTRAORDINARY CIRCUMSTANCES. Text Only Entry(nywlc2, )
August 22, 2019 Filing 6 First MOTION to Continue August 29, 2019 Conference by Plaintiff Lila Brennan. (Monteverde, Juan)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 7/9/19. Consent Form due on or before 8/15/2019. Status Conference set for 8/29/2019 10:30 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. (nmarb, )
June 27, 2019 Filing 4 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (rsams, )
June 27, 2019 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Text Only Entry. (rsams, )
June 27, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE by Plaintiff Lila Brennan (Monteverde, Juan)
June 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against BioScrip, Inc., Michael G. Bronfein, R. Carter Pate, David W. Golding, Michael S. Goldstein, Daniel E. Greenleaf, Steven Neumann, Christopher S. Shackelton (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6764786)Attorney Juan E. Monteverde added to party Lila Brennan(pty:pla), filed by Lila Brennan.(Monteverde, Juan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brennan v. BioScrip, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lila Brennan
Represented By: Juan E. Monteverde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael G. Bronfein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David W. Golding
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher S. Shackelton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BioScrip, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel E. Greenleaf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Carter Pate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Neumann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael S. Goldstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?