Singh v. Barr
Defendant: Jeffrey D Lynch, Johnny Choate, Ronald D Vitiello and Kirstjen M. Nielsen
Petitioner: Malkit Singh
Respondent: William P. Barr
Case Number: 1:2019cv01876
Filed: June 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Gordon P Gallagher
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Third ORDER Directing Applicant to Cure Deficiencies. If Applicant fails to cure the designated deficiencies within thirty (30) days from the date of this order, the action will be dismissed without further notice. The dismissal shall be without prejudice, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 8/14/2019. (angar, )
August 2, 2019 Filing 16 AMENDED APPLICATION for Writ of Habeas Corpus Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2241, filed by Malkit Singh.(angar, )
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Second ORDER Directing Applicant to Cure Deficiencies. If Petitioner fails to cure the designated deficiencies within thirty (30) days from the date of this order, the action will be dismissed without further notice. The dismissal shall be without prejudice, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 7/23/2019. (angar, )
July 18, 2019 Filing 14 Filing fee: $ 5.00, receipt number COX091182 (angar, )
July 18, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Appointment of Counsel Pursuant to 18 U.S.C. 3006A, by Petitioner Malkit Singh. (angar, )
July 18, 2019 Filing 12 AMENDED APPLICATION for Writ of Habeas Corpus Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2241, filed by Malkit Singh.(angar, ) #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2241 - Northern District of California) (angar, ). Modified on 7/19/2019 to add documents (angar, ).
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Directing Applicant to Cure Deficiencies. If Applicant fails to cure the designated deficiencies within thirty (30) days from the date of this order, the action will be dismissed without further notice. The dismissal shall be without prejudice, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 7/3/2019. copies mailed as ordered (angar, )
June 27, 2019 Filing 10 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher. Text Only Entry. (cmadr, )
June 27, 2019 Filing 9 FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawls of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (cmadr, )
June 27, 2019 Filing 8 Case transferred in from District of California Northern; Case Number 5:19-cv-02341. File, transfer order and docket sheet received .
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER OF TRANSFER to the District of Colorado. Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on 6/26/19. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(dmcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/26/2019) Modified text on 6/27/2019 (cv, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 6/27/2019.]
May 10, 2019 Filing 6 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Malkit Singh.. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 6/27/2019.]
April 30, 2019 Filing 5 Notice of Assignment of Prisoner Case to Magistrate Judge (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2019) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/1/2019: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (cv, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 6/27/2019.]
April 30, 2019 Filing 4 CLERK'S NOTICE re completion of In Forma Pauperis affidavit or payment of filing fee due within 28 days. IFP Form due by 6/7/2019. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2019) Modified on 4/30/2019 (cv, COURT STAFF). (cv, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 6/27/2019.]
April 30, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Malkit Singh. (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/2/2019: #1 Affidavit) (cv, COURT STAFF). Modified on 5/2/2019 (cv, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 6/27/2019.]
April 30, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Malkit Singh. (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/2/2019: #1 page 8) (cv, COURT STAFF). Modified on 5/2/2019 (cv, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 6/27/2019.]
April 30, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Filed by Malkit Singh. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2019) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/2/2019: #1 pages 2-13) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/2/2019: #2 Envelope) (cv, COURT STAFF). Modified on 5/2/2019 (cv, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 6/27/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Singh v. Barr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey D Lynch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnny Choate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald D Vitiello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kirstjen M. Nielsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Malkit Singh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: William P. Barr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?