Colorado Investment Group, LLC v. Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company, The
Plaintiff: Colorado Investment Group, LLC and Colorado Investment Group, LLC a Colorado limited liablilty company doing business as CIG Construction
Defendant: Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company, The
Case Number: 1:2019cv01886
Filed: June 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Christine M Arguello
Referring Judge: S Kato Crews
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 SCHEDULING ORDER: by Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 8/22/19. (amont, )
August 22, 2019 Filing 17 COURTROOM MINUTES for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews: Scheduling Conference held on 8/22/2019. Discovery due by 5/22/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 6/22/2020. Joint Status Report due by 11/5/2019. Telephone Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/27/2020 10:00 AM in Courtroom C204 before Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. Counsel participating in the conference shall jointly call the Court (303.335.2124) at the scheduled time. FTR: Courtroom C-204. (amont, )
August 15, 2019 Filing 16 Proposed Scheduling Order by Defendant Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company, The. (Wettestad, Jeri)
August 13, 2019 Filing 15 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendant Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company, The All parties do not consent.. (Wettestad, Jeri)
July 31, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Matthew J. Berman on behalf of Colorado Investment Group, LLCAttorney Matthew J. Berman added to party Colorado Investment Group, LLC(pty:pla) (Berman, Matthew)
July 3, 2019 Filing 13 Defendant's ANSWER to #6 Complaint Separate and Affirmative Defenses and Jury Demand by Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company, The.(Wettestad, Jeri)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER Setting Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference. Scheduling Conference set for 8/22/2019 11:00 AM in Courtroom C204 before Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. The parties shall file their proposed scheduling order, and email a copy in Word format to Crews_Chambers@cod.uscourts.gov, on or before 8/15/2019. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 7/2/19. Text Only Entry (amont, )
June 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews is designated to conduct NDISPO proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b). The parties should expect to be given a firm trial setting that is 90 to 120 days from the date of the final pretrial conference, and should be available for trial accordingly. FURTHER, Court-sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, the Court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. SO ORDERED by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 6/29/2019. Text Only Entry (cmalc2)
June 28, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by David Jeffrey Furtado on behalf of Colorado Investment Group, LLCAttorney David Jeffrey Furtado added to party Colorado Investment Group, LLC(pty:pla) (Furtado, David)
June 28, 2019 Filing 9 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (cmadr, )
June 28, 2019 Filing 8 Case assigned to Judge Christine M. Arguello and drawn to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. Text Only Entry. (cmadr, )
June 28, 2019 Filing 7 STATE COURT ORDER Granting Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint signed by Denver County District Judge Eric Johnson on 6/26/2019. (cmadr, )
June 28, 2019 Filing 6 COMPLAINT against Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company, The, filed by Colorado Investment Group, LLC.(cmadr, )
June 28, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Nathanael Thomas Archuleta on behalf of Colorado Investment Group, LLC d/b/a CIG ConstructionAttorney Nathanael Thomas Archuleta added to party Colorado Investment Group, LLC d/b/a CIG Construction(pty:pla) (Archuleta, Nathanael)
June 28, 2019 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent The Travelers Companies, Inc., Corporate Parent Travelers Indemnity Company, Corporate Parent Travelers Property Casualty Corp., Corporate Parent Travelers Insurance Group Holdings Inc. for The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company. (Wettestad, Jeri)
June 28, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Jeri Jean Wettestad on behalf of The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company (Wettestad, Jeri)
June 28, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Amy M. Samberg on behalf of The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance CompanyAttorney Amy M. Samberg added to party The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company(pty:dft) (Samberg, Amy)
June 28, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company from District Court, Denver County, State of Colorado, Case Number 2019CV31791. (Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number 1082-6767353), filed by The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - State Court Complaint, #3 Exhibit B - State Court Summons, #4 Exhibit C - State Court Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Exhibit D - State Court Delay Reduction Order, #6 Exhibit E - State Court Affidavit of Service, #7 Exhibit F - State Court Appearance J. Wettestad, #8 Exhibit G - State Court Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time, #9 Exhibit H - State Court Order Granting Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time, #10 Exhibit I - State Court Docket, #11 Exhibit J - Plaintiff's Counsel Email Confirming Domicile, #12 Exhibit K - Certificate of Good Standing, #13 Exhibit L-L12 - Table and Exhibits)(Wettestad, Jeri)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Colorado Investment Group, LLC v. Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Colorado Investment Group, LLC
Represented By: David Jeffrey Furtado
Represented By: Nathanael Thomas Archuleta
Represented By: Matthew J. Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Colorado Investment Group, LLC a Colorado limited liablilty company doing business as CIG Construction
Represented By: David Jeffrey Furtado
Represented By: Nathanael Thomas Archuleta
Represented By: Matthew J. Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company, The
Represented By: Amy M. Samberg
Represented By: Jeri Jean Wettestad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?