Cal Farley's Boys Ranch Foundation v. Taylor et al
Plaintiff: Cal Farley's Boys Ranch Foundation
Defendant: Donna Taylor and Robert Taylor
Case Number: 1:2019cv01992
Filed: July 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Robert E Blackburn
Referring Judge: Kathleen M Tafoya
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. IT IS ORDERED that pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this matter is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge:(1) To convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b), enter a Scheduling Order that satisfies the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, and enter such orders as appropriate to enforce the Scheduling order and resolve discovery matters; provided, further that the scheduling conference, the Magistrate Judge shall advise the parties of Judge Blackburns practice standards found at www.cod.uscourts.gov.;(2) To hear and finally determine non-dispositive matters that have been referred, subject to the exceptions found in 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A); and(3) To hear and make recommendations on dispositive matters that have been referred as defined in 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLOLCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, this court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding.By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 8/29/19. Text Only Entry (rebsec)
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MINUTE ORDER: The Scheduling Conference set for September 4, 2019, is vacated. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 8/28/19. Text Only Entry (kmtlc1 )
August 28, 2019 Filing 19 CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to 18 Clerk's Entry of Default. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Robert E. Blackburn. All future pleadings should be designated as 19-cv-01992-REB. (Text Only Entry) (jgonz, )
August 28, 2019 Filing 18 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Donna Taylor, Robert Taylor re #17 MOTION for Entry of Default as to Defendants Robert Taylor and Donna Taylor, by Clerk. Text Only Entry (jgonz, )
August 27, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION for Entry of Default as to Defendants Robert Taylor and Donna Taylor by Plaintiff Cal Farley's Boys Ranch Foundation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Affidavit of Charles Greenhouse, #2 Proposed Order (PDF Only) Order of Default Jmt)(Hickey, Patrick)
August 21, 2019 Filing 16 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Plaintiff Cal Farley's Boys Ranch Foundation All parties consent.. (Hickey, Patrick)
August 12, 2019 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE of Mailing/Service re #10 Order, #13 MOTION for Leave to Appear by Telephone at September 4, 2019 Scheduling/Planning Conference on pro se Defendants by Plaintiff Cal Farley's Boys Ranch Foundation. (Hickey, Patrick)
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MINUTE ORDER granting #13 Motion to Appear by Telephone. Plaintiff's counsel may attend the Scheduling Conference by telephone by initiating a conference call and contacting chambers, 719-575-0328, at the scheduled time. Counsel shall use a LAND LINE; NO CELLULAR, CORDLESS OR SPEAKER PHONES ARE PERMITTED. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 8/9/19. Text Only Entry(kmtlc1 )
August 8, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to Appear by Telephone at September 4, 2019 Scheduling/Planning Conference by Plaintiff Cal Farley's Boys Ranch Foundation. (Hickey, Patrick)
July 30, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cal Farley's Boys Ranch Foundation. Robert Taylor served on 7/19/2019, answer due 8/9/2019. (Hickey, Patrick)
July 30, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cal Farley's Boys Ranch Foundation. Donna Taylor served on 7/19/2019, answer due 8/9/2019. (Hickey, Patrick)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 AMENDED ORDER Scheduling Conference for 9/4/2019 10:45 AM in Courtroom 101 (Colorado Springs) before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Consent Form due by 8/28/2019. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 07/23/2019. (ksena)
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 9/3/2019 10:45 AM in Courtroom 101 (Colorado Springs) before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Consent Form due by 8/27/2019. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 07/12/2019. (ksena)
July 11, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Charles A. Greenhouse on behalf of Cal Farley's Boys Ranch FoundationAttorney Charles A. Greenhouse added to party Cal Farley's Boys Ranch Foundation(pty:pla) (Greenhouse, Charles)
July 11, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Thomas Ray Dixon, Jr on behalf of Cal Farley's Boys Ranch FoundationAttorney Thomas Ray Dixon, Jr added to party Cal Farley's Boys Ranch Foundation(pty:pla) (Dixon, Thomas)
July 11, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (cmadr, )
July 10, 2019 Filing 5 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Text Only Entry. (cmadr, )
July 10, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE re #1 Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet by Plaintiff Cal Farley's Boys Ranch Foundation (Hickey, Patrick)
July 10, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Robert Taylor by Plaintiff Cal Farley's Boys Ranch Foundation. (Hickey, Patrick)
July 10, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Donna Taylor by Plaintiff Cal Farley's Boys Ranch Foundation. (Hickey, Patrick)
July 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Donna Taylor, Robert Taylor (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6783498)Attorney Patrick Joseph Hickey added to party Cal Farley's Boys Ranch Foundation(pty:pla), filed by Cal Farley's Boys Ranch Foundation.(Hickey, Patrick)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cal Farley's Boys Ranch Foundation v. Taylor et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donna Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cal Farley's Boys Ranch Foundation
Represented By: Patrick Joseph Hickey
Represented By: Charles A. Greenhouse
Represented By: Thomas Ray Dixon, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?