Young v. U.S. Attorney General et al
Plaintiff: Timothy Doyle Young
Defendant: U.S. Attorney General, Department of Justice, Judicial Conference Committee and USA
Case Number: 1:2019cv01996
Filed: July 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
Presiding Judge: Lewis T Babcock
Referring Judge: Gordon P Gallagher
Nature of Suit: Prisoner - Civil Rights (U.S. not a defendant)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER Denying #14 Motion to Reconsider, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 9/5/2019.(angar, )
August 26, 2019 Filing 14 RULE 60 Petition to Reopen Case by Plaintiff Timothy Doyle Young. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(evana, )
August 21, 2019 Filing 13 USCA Order as to #9 Notice of Appeal filed by Timothy Doyle Young : the court orders Mr. Young to pay the $505.00 appellate filing fee to the district court by September 11, 2019. If the district court does not receive full payment on or before the deadline, this court will dismiss Mr. Young's appeal for lack of prosecution. See 28 U.S.C. 1915(g); 10th Cir. R. 3.3(B), 42.1. (USCA Case No. 19-1265) (This document is not the Mandate) (evana, )
August 12, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of other Court documents, by Plaintiff Timothy Doyle Young (angar, )
July 24, 2019 Filing 11 USCA Case Number 19-1265 for #9 Notice of Appeal filed by Timothy Doyle Young. (angar, )
July 24, 2019 Filing 10 LETTER Transmitting Notice of Appeal to all counsel advising of the transmittal of the #9 Notice of Appeal filed by Timothy Doyle Young to the U.S. Court of Appeals. (Pro Se, Fee not paid and 1915 motion not filed,) (Attachments: #1 Preliminary Record and Docket Sheet)(angar, )
July 23, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #6 Order Dismissing Case by Plaintiff Timothy Doyle Young. (Attachments: #1 Envelope, #2 Letter)(angar, )
July 22, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of an Application from Another District by Plaintiff Timothy Doyle Young. (sphil, )
July 19, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Order from another District, by Plaintiff Timothy Doyle Young (angar, )
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER CLOSING ACTION, and denying in forma pauperis on appeal, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 7/12/19. The Clerk shall send Plaintiff #1 Complaint (mailed as ordered). (dkals, )
July 10, 2019 Filing 5 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher. Text Only Entry (cmadr, )
July 10, 2019 Filing 4 Case transferred in from District of California Northern; Case Number 3:19-cv-03373. File, transfer order and docket sheet received. Modified to correct filing date on 7/11/2019 (cmadr, ).
July 9, 2019 The United States District Court for the District of Colorado shall receive the contact information from this Court via e-mail/telephone transfer. Rem #3 Order (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/11/2019.]
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER OF TRANSFER. This suit is TRANSFERRED to the District of Colorado. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 07/09/2019. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/11/2019.]
June 13, 2019 Filing 2 CLERK'S NOTICE re completion of In Forma Pauperis affidavit or payment of filing fee due within 28 days. IFP Form due by 7/22/2019. (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/11/2019.]
June 13, 2019 Filing 1 CIVIL COMPLAINT; (NO PROCESS); (IFP PENDING); against Department of Justice, Judicial Conference Committee, U.S. Attorney General, United States. Filed byTimothy Doyle Young. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/11/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Young v. U.S. Attorney General et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Justice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judicial Conference Committee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Doyle Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?