Blue Skies EL 600, LLC et al v. United Airlines, Inc.
Plaintiff: Griffin Holdings, LLC and Blue Skies EL 600, LLC
Defendant: United Airlines, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv02002
Filed: July 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Kristen L Mix
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 29, 2019 Filing 16 ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES:re: #15 Notice of Entry of Appearance, filed by attorneyMichael S. Richardson. DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. Action to take - counsel must submit a change of contact request through the Attorney Services Portal Account pursuant to D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(c) and 3.5 of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases).(Text Only Entry) (nmarb, )
August 29, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Michael S. Richardson on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Michael S. Richardson added to party Blue Skies EL 600, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Michael S. Richardson added to party Griffin Holdings, LLC(pty:pla) (Richardson, Michael)
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 8/28/19 GRANTING #13 Unopposed Motion to Reschedule Scheduling Conference. Proposed Scheduling Order due on or before 10/31/2019. Scheduling Conference set for 9/11/19 at 10:00 AM is VACATED and RESET to 11/7/2019 11:00 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix.(nmarb, )
August 28, 2019 Filing 13 Unopposed MOTION for Hearing/Conference re #9 Order, to Reschedule Scheduling Conference by Plaintiffs Blue Skies EL 600, LLC, Griffin Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Bell, Thomas)
August 28, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Thomas Clay Bell on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Thomas Clay Bell added to party Blue Skies EL 600, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Thomas Clay Bell added to party Griffin Holdings, LLC(pty:pla) (Bell, Thomas)
August 8, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to #5 Complaint and Jury Demand by United Airlines, Inc..(Clouatre, Mark)
July 18, 2019 Filing 10 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #5 Complaint by Defendant United Airlines, Inc.. (Clouatre, Mark)
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 7/12/19 Setting Scheduling/Planning Conference. Proposed Scheduling Order due on or before 9/4/2019. Scheduling/Planning Conference set for 9/11/2019 10:00 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1, #2 Attachment 2) (nmarb, )
July 12, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Adrienne Lee Toon on behalf of United Airlines, Inc.Attorney Adrienne Lee Toon added to party United Airlines, Inc.(pty:dft) (Toon, Adrienne)
July 11, 2019 Filing 7 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (rsams, )
July 11, 2019 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT/RETURN of Service of Summons and Complaint and Jury Demand upon United Airlines, Inc. on June 20, 2019. (rsams, )
July 11, 2019 Filing 5 COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against United Airlines, Inc., filed by Blue Skies EL 600, LLC, Griffin Holdings, LLC.(rsams, )
July 11, 2019 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Clouatre, Mark)
July 11, 2019 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. Text Only Entry. (rsams, )
July 11, 2019 Filing 2 FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawls of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (rsams, )
July 11, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by United Airlines, Inc. from Denver County District Court, Case Number 2019CV32402. (Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number 1082-6785446), filed by United Airlines, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit State Court Complaint and Jury Demand, #3 Exhibit State Court Affidavit of Service of Summons, #4 Exhibit State Court Delay Reduction Order, #5 Exhibit State Court Pre-Trial Order, #6 Exhibit State Court Register of Actions, #7 Exhibit Email re Citizenship of Plaintiff, #8 Docket Sheet, #9 Civil Cover Sheet)(Clouatre, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Blue Skies EL 600, LLC et al v. United Airlines, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Griffin Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Michael S. Richardson
Represented By: Thomas Clay Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Blue Skies EL 600, LLC
Represented By: Michael S. Richardson
Represented By: Thomas Clay Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Airlines, Inc.
Represented By: Mark Thomas Clouatre
Represented By: Adrienne Lee Toon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?