Harrington, III v. Engaged Media, Inc.
Plaintiff: Blaine Harrington, III
Defendant: Engaged Media, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv02025
Filed: July 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Philip A Brimmer
Referring Judge: Kristen L Mix
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 30, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, Attorney Aaron Zachary Tobin added to party Engaged Media, Inc. (pty:dft) by Engaged Media, Inc..(Tobin, Aaron)
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING/PLANNING CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 7/19/19. Scheduling Conference set for 10/15/2019 10:00 AM in Courtroom A401 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1, #2 Attachment 2, #3 Attachment 3) (lgale, )
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix for non-dispositive matters. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72 (a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, and (4) conduct a pretrial conference and enter a pretrial order. Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, this court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding, by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 7/16/2019. Text Only Entry. (sphil, )
July 15, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (cmadr, )
July 14, 2019 Filing 3 Case assigned to Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer and drawn to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. Text Only Entry. (cmadr, )
July 14, 2019 Filing 2 Report re Copyright: Report on the filing of an action emailed separately to the Director of the Copyright Office. (cmadr, )
July 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ENGAGED MEDIA INC. (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6789372)Attorney David Deal added to party Blaine Harrington(pty:pla), filed by Blaine Harrington. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Deal, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harrington, III v. Engaged Media, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Blaine Harrington, III
Represented By: David Deal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Engaged Media, Inc.
Represented By: Aaron Zachary Tobin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?