Harrington v. Simply Pets LLC et al
Plaintiff: Blaine Harrington, III
Defendant: Simply Pets LLC and Lisa Smith-Putnam
Case Number: 1:2019cv02028
Filed: July 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Christine M Arguello
Referring Judge: N Reid Neureiter
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter is designated to conduct NDISPO proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b). The parties should expect to be given a firm trial setting that is 90 to 120 days from the date of the final pretrial conference, and should be available for trial accordingly. FURTHER, Court-sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, the Court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. SO ORDERED by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 9/11/2019. Text Only Entry (cmalc3)
September 11, 2019 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE, by Senior Judge Lewis T. Babcock. This case is randomly returned to Judge Christine M. Arguello for all further proceedings. All future pleadings should be designated as 19-cv-20280-CMA (angar, )
September 9, 2019 Filing 6 CASE REASSIGNED. All parties do not consent/time elapsed. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Lewis T. Babcock. All future pleadings should be designated as 19-cv-02028-LTB. (Text Only Entry) (slibi, )
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 7/15/2019. Consent Form due by 9/6/2019. Scheduling Conference set for 9/20/2019 10:00 AM in Courtroom C205 before Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. (tsher, )
July 15, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (rvill, )
July 14, 2019 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. Text Only Entry. (rvill, )
July 14, 2019 Filing 2 Report re Copyright: Report on the filing of an action emailed separately to the Director of the Copyright Office. (rvill, )
July 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Simply Pets LLC, Lisa Smith-Putnam (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6789396)Attorney David Deal added to party Blaine Harrington(pty:pla), filed by Blaine Harrington. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(Deal, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harrington v. Simply Pets LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Simply Pets LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa Smith-Putnam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Blaine Harrington, III
Represented By: David Deal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?