Dungy v. Dungy
Plaintiff: Donald Dungy
Defendant: Elizabeth Dungy, Tomee Crespin, W. Berkeley Mann, Jr. and Child Support Services
Case Number: 1:2019cv02033
Filed: July 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Lewis T Babcock
Referring Judge: Gordon P Gallagher
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE To Court Objection Trespass Upon Rights 18 USC Section 242 Deprivation of Rights by Plaintiff Donald Dungy (evana, )
September 10, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE to Court Objection Trespass Upon Rights Guaranteed by Bill of Rights by Plaintiff Donald Dungy (evana, )
August 26, 2019 Filing 10 RECOMMENDATION OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE that the Complaint (ECF No. #6 ) be dismissed without prejudice for lack of jurisdiction, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 8/26/2019. (evana, )
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER OF REFERENCE TO UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE. This action is under review pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 8.1. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b), Fed. R. Civ. P. 72, and D.C.COLO.LCivR 72.1, United States Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher is designated to conduct proceedings in this civil action as follows:Perform duties set forth in D.C.COLO.LCivR 8.1.; Hear and determine pretrial matters, including all nondispositive motions and other requests seeking court action; Conduct hearings, including evidentiary hearings, at the magistrate judge's discretion; Submit recommendations for rulings on dispositive motions; Submit recommendations for disposition of all or part of this action as required under D.C.COLO.LCivR 8.1, 28 U.S.C. 1915, 28 U.S.C. 1915A,and/or 42 U.S.C. 1997e; Determine and resolve nondispositive post-judgment motions and other requests seeking court action, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 8/26/2019. (evana, )
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER Pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 8.1, the Clerk of Court is directed to assign this matter to Senior Judge Lewis T. Babcock. The undersigned will remain as the assigned magistrate judge, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 8/23/2019. All future pleadings should be designated as 19-cv-2033 LTB (evana, )
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO PROCEED UNDER 28 U.S.C. 1915, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 8/16/2019.(evana, )
August 1, 2019 Filing 6 COMPLAINT against Elizabeth Dungy, W. Berkeley Mann, Jr, Tomee Crespin, Child Support Services, filed by Donald Dungy. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(evana, )
August 1, 2019 Filing 5 Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs. by Plaintiff Donald Dungy. (evana, )
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO CURE DEFICIENCIES within thirty (30) days from the date of this order. Any papers that Plaintiff files in response to this order must include the civil action number on this order. That Plaintiff shall either pay the $400.00 filing fee or obtain and utilize the court-approved Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs (Long Form) form, along with the applicable instructions, at www.cod.uscourts.gov. That, if Plaintiff fails to cure all of the designated deficiencies within thirty (30) days from the date of this order, the action will be dismissed without further notice. The dismissal shall be without prejudice. Plaintiff is strongly encouraged to contact the Federal Pro Se Clinic at (303) 380-8786 or https://www.cobar.org/cofederalproseclinic for possible assistance in this matter. The Federal Pro Se Clinic is located on the first floor of the Alfred A. Arraj United States Courthouse, 901 19th Street, Denver, Colorado 80294, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 7/16/2019. (evana, )
July 15, 2019 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher. Text Only Entry. (rroge, )
July 15, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE to Court Take Judicial Notice Under Federal Rules of Evidence 201 (D) Requires Free Access to Judicial Tribunals by a Natural Individual With a Constitutional Right to Petition the Court Set By Precedence Crandall V. Nevada, 73 US 35 - Supreme Court 1868 by Plaintiff Donald Dungy (rroge, )
July 15, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE of Petition Non-Statutory Writ of Habeas Corpus Article 1 Section 9 United States Constitution [ Oral Presentation on Date of Filing is Demanded ] by Plaintiff Donald Dungy (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(rroge, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dungy v. Dungy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Dungy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elizabeth Dungy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tomee Crespin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W. Berkeley Mann, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Child Support Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?