Lickerish, Ltd. et al v. Lawrence Covell, Inc.
Plaintiff: Lickerish, Ltd. and Phill Taylor
Defendant: Lawrence Covell, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv02120
Filed: July 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Robert E Blackburn
Referring Judge: Nina Y Wang
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:501
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 TRIAL PREPARATION CONFERENCE ORDER by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 9/20/19. All motions raising issues under Fed. R. Evid. 702, 703, 704, or 705 as codified and construed shall be filed by June 29, 2019. A combined Final Pretrial Conference and Trial Preparation Conference is set 12/3/2020 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. Three Day Jury Trial is set 12/28/2020 through 12/30/2020 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. (rebsec)
September 18, 2019 Filing 19 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang: Scheduling Conference held on 9/18/2019. Discovery due by 4/10/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 5/11/2020. Final Pretrial Conference and Trial Preparation Conference set for 12/3/2020, 11:00 AM, in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. 3-Day Jury Trial set to commence on 12/28/2020, 08:30 AM, in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. Proposed Final Pretrial Order shall be submitted in accordance with Judge Robert E. Blackburns Practice Standards. FTR: A-502. (rkeec)
September 12, 2019 Filing 18 Proposed Scheduling Order by Plaintiffs Lickerish, Ltd., Phill Taylor. (Grossbardt, Jonah)
August 27, 2019 Filing 17 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, and Jury Demand by Lawrence Covell, Inc..(Robinson, Jack)
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #9 Motion to Vacate. Scheduling Conference RESET for 9/18/2019 03:00 PM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang; Proposed Scheduling Order due 9/11/2019. ORDER granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond. Defendant's answer or other responsive pleading due 8/28. By Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 8.23.2019. Text Only Entry(nywlc1, )
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. IT IS ORDERED that pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this matter is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge:(1) To convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b), enter a Scheduling Order that satisfies the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, and enter such orders as appropriate to enforce the Scheduling order and resolve discovery matters; provided, further that the scheduling conference, the Magistrate Judge shall advise the parties of Judge Blackburns practice standards found at www.cod.uscourts.gov.;(2) To hear and finally determine non-dispositive matters that have been referred, subject to the exceptions found in 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A); and(3) To hear and make recommendations on dispositive matters that have been referred as defined in 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLOLCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, this court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 8/21/19. Text Only Entry (rebsec)
August 21, 2019 Filing 14 MEMORANDUM by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 8/21/19 regarding #9 MOTION to Vacate 8 Minute Order,, Scheduling Conference filed by Phill Taylor, Lickerish, Ltd., #13 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond filed by Lawrence Covell, Inc.. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Text Only Entry (rebsec)
August 21, 2019 Filing 13 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond by Defendant Lawrence Covell, Inc.. (Robinson, Jack)
August 20, 2019 Filing 12 CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #11 Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge. All parties do not consent. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Robert E. Blackburn. All future pleadings should be designated as 19-cv-02120-REB. (Text Only Entry) (nmarb, )
August 19, 2019 Filing 11 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Plaintiffs Lickerish, Ltd., Phill Taylor. All parties do not consent. (nmarb, )
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER : The Status Conference set 8/21 is VACATED based upon the filing of a completed Consent/Non-Consent Form. By Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 8.19.2019. Text Only Entry (nywlc1, )
August 19, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Vacate 8 Minute Order,, Scheduling Conference by Plaintiffs Lickerish, Ltd., Phill Taylor. (Attachments: #1 Consent/Declination of Magistrate)(Grossbardt, Jonah)
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER : Pursuant to the Order dated August 6, 2019 #7 , a completed Consent/Non-Consent Form was due 8/16 and has not been submitted. Therefore, a Status Conference is set for 8/21/2019 11:30 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. In-person attendance is mandatory. The Status Conference will automatically vacate upon filing of a completed Form. If it is not possible to submit a Form signed by both parties, the status conference would also automatically vacate if only signed by Plaintiff and accompanied by an appropriate motion to vacate or reset the Scheduling Conference set 8/30. By Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 8.19.2019. Text Only Entry (nywlc1, )
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 8/6/2019. Consent Form due by 8/16/2019. Proposed Scheduling Order due8/23/2019 Scheduling Conference set for 8/30/2019 10:00 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. (tsher, )
July 30, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lickerish, Ltd., Phill Taylor. Lawrence Covell, Inc. served on 7/24/2019, answer due 8/14/2019. (Rothman, Joel)
July 24, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by William Serge Wenzel on behalf of Lickerish, Ltd., Phill TaylorAttorney William Serge Wenzel added to party Lickerish, Ltd.(pty:pla), Attorney William Serge Wenzel added to party Phill Taylor(pty:pla) (Wenzel, William)
July 23, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (cmadr, )
July 23, 2019 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Text Only Entry. (cmadr, )
July 23, 2019 Filing 2 Report re Copyright: Report on the filing of an action emailed separately to the Director of the Copyright Office. (cmadr, )
July 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Copyright Infringement (Injunctive Relief Demanded) against Lawrence Covell, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6804731)Attorney Joel B. Rothman added to party Lickerish, Ltd.(pty:pla), Attorney Joel B. Rothman added to party Phill Taylor(pty:pla), filed by Lickerish, Ltd., Phill Taylor. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Registration, #2 Exhibit 2 - Infringement, #3 Exhibit 3 - Demand Letters, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Summons)(Rothman, Joel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lickerish, Ltd. et al v. Lawrence Covell, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lickerish, Ltd.
Represented By: Joel B. Rothman
Represented By: William Serge Wenzel
Represented By: Jonah Adam Grossbardt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phill Taylor
Represented By: Joel B. Rothman
Represented By: William Serge Wenzel
Represented By: Jonah Adam Grossbardt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lawrence Covell, Inc.
Represented By: Jack David Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?