Otter Products, LLC v. Jel Sert Co., The
Plaintiff: Otter Products, LLC
Defendant: The Jel Sert Co. and Jel Sert Co., The
Case Number: 1:2019cv02126
Filed: July 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Christine M Arguello
Referring Judge: Nina Y Wang
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 20, 2019 Filing 25 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Plaintiff Otter Products, LLC. (Jozefczyk, Dana)
September 20, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Ryan James Fletcher on behalf of Otter Products, LLCAttorney Ryan James Fletcher added to party Otter Products, LLC(pty:pla) (Fletcher, Ryan)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #21 Motion for Hearing/Conference by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 09/13/2019. Oral Argument set for 11/20/2019 10:00 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. This court highly encourages, but does not require, that the attorneys arguing the Motion to Dismiss have five or less years of experience. Text Only Entry(nywlc1, )
September 11, 2019 Filing 22 MEMORANDUM regarding #21 Plaintiff's Request for Oral Hearing on Motion to Dismiss filed by Otter Products, LLC. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 9/11/2019. Text Only Entry (cmalc2)
September 11, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION for Hearing/Conference re #17 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Plaintiff Otter Products, LLC. (Jozefczyk, Dana)
September 11, 2019 Filing 20 RESPONSE to #17 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Plaintiff Otter Products, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Heather Kliebenstein, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D)(Jozefczyk, Dana)
August 26, 2019 Filing 19 MEMORANDUM regarding #17 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Jel Sert Co., The. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 8/26/2019. Text Only Entry (cmalc2)
August 21, 2019 Filing 18 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Thoreson, Nathan)
August 21, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Defendant Jel Sert Co., The. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Antony J. McShane with attachments)(Thoreson, Nathan)
August 21, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Nathan Brown Thoreson on behalf of Jel Sert Co., TheAttorney Nathan Brown Thoreson added to party Jel Sert Co., The(pty:dft) (Thoreson, Nathan)
August 21, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Cindy Coles Oliver on behalf of Jel Sert Co., TheAttorney Cindy Coles Oliver added to party Jel Sert Co., The(pty:dft) (Oliver, Cindy)
August 16, 2019 Filing 14 ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES: re: #12 Notice of Entry of Appearance filed by attorneyHeather Kliebenstein. DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. Action to take - counsel must submit a change of contact request through the Attorney Services Portal Account pursuant to D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(c) and 3.5 of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures. The address on the docket sheet and the address and the document filed are not the same. (Civil cases).(Text Only Entry) (evana, )
August 16, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Ian Garrett McFarland on behalf of Otter Products, LLCAttorney Ian Garrett McFarland added to party Otter Products, LLC(pty:pla) (McFarland, Ian)
August 16, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Heather J. Kliebenstein on behalf of Otter Products, LLCAttorney Heather J. Kliebenstein added to party Otter Products, LLC(pty:pla) (Kliebenstein, Heather)
August 12, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance of Heather Kliebenstein by Dana Patrice Jozefczyk on behalf of Otter Products, LLC (Jozefczyk, Dana)
August 8, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Otter Products, LLC. Jel Sert Co., The served on 8/1/2019, answer due 8/22/2019. (Jozefczyk, Dana)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 8/1/19 Setting Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference. Proposed Scheduling Order due 9/24/2019. Scheduling Conference set for 10/1/2019 10:00 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. (nmarb, )
August 1, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (evana, )
July 31, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS REQUEST as to The Jel Sert Co. re #1 Complaint, by Plaintiff Otter Products, LLC. (Jozefczyk, Dana)
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang is designated to conduct NDISPO proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b). It is FURTHER ORDERED that unless service has otherwise been completed or arranged, Plaintiffs counsel OR Plaintiff is directed to effect service of the summons and complaint pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure no later than (90 days) in order for the initial scheduling conference to be held promptly. The parties should expect to be given a firm trial setting that is 90 to 120 days from the date of the final pretrial conference, and should be available for trial accordingly. FURTHER, Court-sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, the Court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. SO ORDERED by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 7/25/2019. Text Only Entry (cmalc3)
July 24, 2019 Filing 5 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). No Summons Issued. (rsams, )
July 24, 2019 Filing 4 Report re Patent/Trademark: Report on the filing of an action emailed (NEF) to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (rsams, )
July 24, 2019 Filing 3 Case assigned to Judge Christine M. Arguello and drawn to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Text Only Entry. (rsams, )
July 24, 2019 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Blue Ocean Enterprises, Inc. for Otter Products, LLC. (Jozefczyk, Dana)
July 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against The Jel Sert Co. (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6807425) Attorney Dana Patrice Jozefczyk added to party Otter Products, LLC(pty:pla), filed by Otter Products, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(Jozefczyk, Dana)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Otter Products, LLC v. Jel Sert Co., The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Otter Products, LLC
Represented By: Dana Patrice Jozefczyk
Represented By: Ryan James Fletcher
Represented By: Ian Garrett McFarland
Represented By: Heather J. Kliebenstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Jel Sert Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jel Sert Co., The
Represented By: Cindy Coles Oliver
Represented By: Nathan Brown Thoreson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?