DISH Network, LLC v. Albertis, Inc.
Plaintiff: DISH Network, LLC
Defendant: Albertis, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv02179
Filed: July 31, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Daniel D Domenico
Referring Judge: N Reid Neureiter
Nature of Suit: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 09:0207
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2019 Filing 9 COURTROOM MINUTES for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter: Status Conference held on 9/24/2019. Telephonic Status Conference set for 11/4/2019 10:00 AM in Courtroom C203 before Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. FTR: Courtroom C203. (slibi, )
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of Local Civ. R. 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, (4) conduct hearings, including evidentiary hearings, and submit proposed findings of fact and recommendations for rulings on dispositive motions, and (5) pursuant to Local Civ. R. 16.6 and at the discretion of the Magistrate Judge, convene such early neutral evaluation and/or settlement conferences and direct related procedures as may facilitate resolution of this case without the necessity of a motion or prior authorization of the undersigned. SO ORDERED by Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 9/10/2019. Text Only Entry (dddlc3, )
September 10, 2019 Filing 7 CASE REASSIGNED. All parties do not consent. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Daniel D. Domenico. All future pleadings should be designated as 19-cv-02179-DDD. (Text Only Entry) (slibi, )
September 10, 2019 Filing 6 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Plaintiff DISH Network, LLC All parties do not consent.. (Olsen, Richard)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 8/1/2019. Consent Form due by 9/10/2019. Status Conference set for 9/24/2019 10:30 AM in Courtroom C205 before Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. (tsher, )
July 31, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (cmadr, )
July 31, 2019 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. Text Only Entry. (cmadr, )
July 31, 2019 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent DISH Network Corporation, Corporate Parent Dish DBS Corporation for DISH Network, LLC. (Olsen, Richard)
July 31, 2019 Filing 1 APPLICATION to Confirm Arbitration Award (Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number 1082-6818767)Attorney Richard Robert Olsen added to party DISH Network, LLC(pty:pla), filed by DISH Network, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A" in support of Application to Confirm Arbitration Award, #2 Exhibit "B" in support of Application to Confirm Arbitration Award, #3 Exhibit "C" in support of Application to Confirm Arbitration Award, #4 Affidavit of Richard Olsen in support of Application to Confirm Arbitration Award, #5 Summons on Defendant Albertis, Inc., d/b/a Boom Digital Satellite TV, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Olsen, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DISH Network, LLC v. Albertis, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Albertis, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DISH Network, LLC
Represented By: Richard Robert Olsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?