Frontier Astronautics, LLC v. Frontier Aerospace Corp.
Plaintiff: Frontier Astronautics, LLC
Defendant: Frontier Aerospace Corp.
Case Number: 1:2019cv02186
Filed: July 31, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Michael E Hegarty
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER granting #8 Motion to Continue Scheduling Conference by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 9/19/2019.Consent Form due by 11/1/2019. Scheduling Conference is VACATED and RESET to 11/21/2019 01:45 PM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty.(tsher, )
September 18, 2019 Filing 8 Unopposed MOTION to Continue Scheduling Conference by Plaintiff Frontier Astronautics, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Walsworth, Ian)
September 17, 2019 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Frontier Astronautics, LLC. Frontier Aerospace Corp. waiver sent on 9/13/2019, answer due 11/12/2019. (Walsworth, Ian)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MINUTE ORDER The parties shall complete and file the #7 Magistrate JudgeConsent Form on or before September 20, 2019. It is further ORDERED that the Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) Scheduling Conference shall be heldon October 10, 2019, at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom A-501, on the fifth floor of the Alfred A. Arraj United States Courthouse located at 901 19th Street, Denver, Colorado. ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 8/1/2019. (cthom, )
July 31, 2019 Filing 5 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. No Summons Issued. (cmadr, )
July 31, 2019 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Text Only Entry. (cmadr, )
July 31, 2019 Filing 3 Report re Patent/Trademark: Report on the filing of an action emailed (NEF) to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (cmadr, )
July 31, 2019 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Walsworth, Ian)
July 31, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against FRONTIER AEROSPACE CORP. (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6819226)Attorney Ian Richard Walsworth added to party Frontier Astronautics, LLC(pty:pla), filed by Frontier Astronautics, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3)(Walsworth, Ian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Frontier Astronautics, LLC v. Frontier Aerospace Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frontier Astronautics, LLC
Represented By: Ian Richard Walsworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frontier Aerospace Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?