PopSockets LLC v. Sussman
Plaintiff: PopSockets LLC
Defendant: Michoel Sussman
Case Number: 1:2019cv02199
Filed: August 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Nina Y Wang
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion to Reset by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 8/29/2019. Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint on or before 10/5/2019; the Consent Form is now due by 10/9/2019; and the Scheduling Conference is RESET for 10/23/2019 10:30 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang, with the Proposed Scheduling Order due by 10/16/2019. No further extensions will be granted absent extraordinary circumstances. Text Only Entry(nywlc2, )
August 28, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Reset Scheduling Conference and Motion to Extend Related Deadlines by Plaintiff PopSockets LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Groves, Matthew)
August 28, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by PopSockets LLC. Michoel Sussman served on 8/15/2019, answer due 9/5/2019. (Groves, Matthew)
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 8/8/19 Setting Scheduling/Planning Conference and Setting Deadline for Filing of Consent/Nonconsent Form. Consent Form due by 9/9/2019. Proposed Scheduling Order due by 9/16/2019. Scheduling/Planning Conference set for 9/23/2019 10:30 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. (nmarb, )
August 2, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (cmadr, )
August 1, 2019 Filing 5 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Text Only Entry. (cmadr, )
August 1, 2019 Filing 4 Report re Patent/Trademark: Report on the filing of an action emailed (NEF) to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (cmadr, )
August 1, 2019 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Groves, Matthew)
August 1, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Michoel Sussman re #1 Complaint, by Plaintiff PopSockets LLC. (Groves, Matthew)
August 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES, INJUNCTIVE AND OTHER RELIEF FOR VIOLATIONS OF 15 U.S.C. 1114; 15 U.S.C. 1125; C.R.S. 6-1-105; TORTIOUS INTERFERENCE; AND RELATED CLAIMS; AND JURY DEMAND against Michoel Sussman (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6822040)Attorney Matthew Ray Groves added to party PopSockets LLC(pty:pla), filed by PopSockets LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Groves, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PopSockets LLC v. Sussman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PopSockets LLC
Represented By: Matthew Ray Groves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michoel Sussman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?