USA v. 5464 Bestwood Road, Larkspur, CO 80118
Plaintiff: USA
Defendant: 5464 Bestwood Road, Larkspur, CO 80118
Claimant: Eric Seymour
Case Number: 1:2019cv02227
Filed: August 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Robert E Blackburn
Referring Judge: Nina Y Wang
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:881
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #13 Motion to Stay by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 10/4/2019. See [#15 ]. Text Only Entry(nywlc2, )
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER AND RECOMMENDATION OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 10/4/19 GRANTING #13 Unopposed MOTION to Stay Proceedings filed by Eric Seymour. The Status Conference set for October 9, 2019 at 10:00 a.m. is VACATED. This court respectfully RECOMMENDS that Judge Blackburn ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSE this matter subject to reopening for good cause, including the outcome of the related criminal case. (nmarb, )
October 3, 2019 Filing 14 MEMORANDUM by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 10/3/19 regarding #13 Unopposed MOTION to Stay Proceedings filed by Eric Seymour. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Text Only Entry (rebsec)
October 2, 2019 Filing 13 Unopposed MOTION to Stay Proceedings by Claimant Eric Seymour. (Merritt, Jeralyn)
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. IT IS ORDERED that pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this matter is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge:(1) To convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b), enter a Scheduling Order that satisfies the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, and enter such orders as appropriate to enforce the Scheduling order and resolve discovery matters; provided, further that the scheduling conference, the Magistrate Judge shall advise the parties of Judge Blackburns practice standards found at www.cod.uscourts.gov.;(2) To hear and finally determine non-dispositive matters that have been referred, subject to the exceptions found in 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A); and(3) To hear and make recommendations on dispositive matters that have been referred as defined in 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLOLCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, this court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding.By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 9/26/19. Text Only Entry (rebsec)
September 25, 2019 Filing 11 CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #10 Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge. All parties do not consent. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Robert E. Blackburn. All future pleadings should be designated as 19-cv-02227-REB. (Text Only Entry) (nmarb, )
September 25, 2019 Filing 10 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Plaintiff USA All parties do not consent.. (Andrews, Tonya)
September 10, 2019 Filing 9 CLAIM by Claimant Eric Seymour. (Merritt, Jeralyn)
September 10, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance for Claimant by Jeralyn E. Merritt on behalf of Eric SeymourAttorney Jeralyn E. Merritt added to party Eric Seymour(pty:clm) (Merritt, Jeralyn)
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 8/22/2019. In light of #6 Notice (Other) filed by USA, the Consent Form is now due by 9/25/2019, and the Status Conference is RESET for 10/9/2019 10:00 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Text Only Entry (nywlc2, )
August 22, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FOR FORFEITURE by Plaintiff USA (Andrews, Tonya)
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 8/8/19. Consent Form due by 9/12/2019. Status Conference set for 9/26/2019 09:00 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. (nmarb, )
August 6, 2019 Filing 4 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (rvill, )
August 6, 2019 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Text Only Entry. (rvill, )
August 6, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Lis Pendens 5464 Bestwood Road, Larkspur, CO 80118 by Plaintiff USA (Andrews, Tonya)
August 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR FORFEITURE IN REM against 5464 Bestwood Road, Larkspur, CO 80118 Attorney Tonya Shotwell Andrews added to party USA(pty:pla), filed by USA. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Andrews, Tonya)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USA v. 5464 Bestwood Road, Larkspur, CO 80118
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 5464 Bestwood Road, Larkspur, CO 80118
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: USA
Represented By: Tonya Shotwell Andrews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Eric Seymour
Represented By: Jeralyn E. Merritt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?