Bankers Standard Insurance Company v. BrassCraft Manufacturing Company
Plaintiff: Bankers Standard Insurance Company, a Pennsylvania corporation and Bankers Standard Insurance Company
Defendant: BrassCraft Manufacturing Company, a Michigan corporation and BrassCraft Manufacturing Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv02250
Filed: August 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Kristen L Mix
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2019 Filing 17 KLM Civil Motions Practice Standards, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. (nmarb, )
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER OF REFERENCE. Pursuant to the consent of the parties to the jurisdiction of the magistrate judge #14 , this case is referred to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix for all purposes pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 10/1/19. Text Only Entry (pabsec)
September 30, 2019 Filing 15 Proposed Scheduling Order by Defendant BrassCraft Manufacturing Company. (Baucom, Christopher)
September 30, 2019 Filing 14 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendant BrassCraft Manufacturing Company All parties consent.. (Baucom, Christopher)
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Leave to Appear Telephonically. Counsel for Defendant shall call the Court at 303-335-2770 on a land line at the time of the Scheduling Conference. All parties who are granted leave to appear telephonically must initiate a conference call via land lines before dialing the Court. by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 9/27/2019. Text Only Entry(klmlc2, )
September 27, 2019 Filing 12 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Appear for October 7, 2019 Scheduling Conference by Telephone by Defendant BrassCraft Manufacturing Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Baucom, Christopher)
August 15, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Christopher Duke Baucom on behalf of BrassCraft Manufacturing CompanyAttorney Christopher Duke Baucom added to party BrassCraft Manufacturing Company(pty:dft) (Baucom, Christopher)
August 14, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to #6 Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by BrassCraft Manufacturing Company.(Dowd, Nicholas)
August 8, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Richard Roy Rardin on behalf of Bankers Standard Insurance CompanyAttorney Richard Roy Rardin added to party Bankers Standard Insurance Company(pty:pla) (Rardin, Richard)
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 8/8/19 Setting Scheduling/Planning Conference. Proposed Scheduling Order due by 9/30/2019. Scheduling/Planning Conference set for 10/7/2019 09:30 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1, #2 Attachment 2) (nmarb, )
August 7, 2019 Filing 7 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (rsams, )
August 7, 2019 Filing 6 COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against BrassCraft Manufacturing Company, filed by Bankers Standard Insurance Company.(rsams, )
August 7, 2019 Filing 5 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. Text Only Entry. (rsams, )
August 7, 2019 Filing 4 FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawls of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (rsams, )
August 7, 2019 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Dowd, Nicholas)
August 7, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE to Plaintiff of Removal by Defendant BrassCraft Manufacturing Company, a Michigan corporation (Dowd, Nicholas)
August 7, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by BrassCraft Manufacturing Company, a Michigan corporation from District Court, Eagle County, Colorado, Case Number 2019cv30159. (Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number 1082-6831513), filed by BrassCraft Manufacturing Company, a Michigan corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Complaint and Jury Demand, #2 Exhibit B - State Court Civil Case Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit C - State Court Civil Summons, #4 Exhibit D - State Court Delay Reduction and E-Filing Order, #5 Exhibit E - State Court Order RE Rule 121 Duty to Confer, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Dowd, Nicholas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bankers Standard Insurance Company v. BrassCraft Manufacturing Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bankers Standard Insurance Company, a Pennsylvania corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bankers Standard Insurance Company
Represented By: Richard Roy Rardin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BrassCraft Manufacturing Company, a Michigan corporation
Represented By: Nicholas William Dowd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BrassCraft Manufacturing Company
Represented By: Nicholas William Dowd
Represented By: Christopher Duke Baucom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?