Buscaino v. Barolsky
Plaintiff: Tatiana Buscaino
Defendant: George Barolsky
Case Number: 1:2019cv02255
Filed: August 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Robert E Blackburn
Referring Judge: Michael E Hegarty
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 10/1/2019. (tsher, )
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 TRIAL PREPARATION CONFERENCE ORDER by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 9/30/19. All motions raising issues under Fed. R. Evid. 401, 702, 703, or 704, as codified and construed shall be filed by April 2, 2020. A combined Final Pretrial Conference and Trial Preparation Conference is set 10/15/2020 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. Three Day Jury Trial is set 11/2/2020 through 11/4/2020 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. (rebsec) Modified on 10/1/2019 to correct date of order (rebsec).
September 30, 2019 Filing 22 COURTROOM MINUTES for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty: Scheduling Conference held on 9/30/2019. Discovery Deadline: April 1, 2020. Dispositive Motion Deadline: May 1, 2020. Initial Rule 26(a)(2) Disclosures: February 3, 2020. Rebuttal Rule 26(a)(2) Disclosures: March 2, 2020. Combined Final Pretrial and Trial Preparation Conference set for 10/15/2020 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. 3 day Jury Trial set for 11/2/2020 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. FTR: A501. (cthom, )
September 23, 2019 Filing 21 Proposed Scheduling Order Proposed Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Tatiana Buscaino. (Nolt, Michael)
September 23, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance Entry of Appearance by Michael Jeffrey Nolt on behalf of Tatiana BuscainoAttorney Michael Jeffrey Nolt added to party Tatiana Buscaino(pty:pla) (Nolt, Michael)
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 9/20/2019. Scheduling Conference is VACATED and RESET to 9/30/2019 10:00 AM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. (tsher, )
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 9/19/2019. Scheduling Conference set for 9/23/2019 10:15 AM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. (tsher, )
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. IT IS ORDERED that pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this matter is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge:(1) To convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b), enter a Scheduling Order that satisfies the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, and enter such orders as appropriate to enforce the Scheduling order and resolve discovery matters; provided, further that the scheduling conference, the Magistrate Judge shall advise the parties of Judge Blackburns practice standards found at www.cod.uscourts.gov.;(2) To hear and finally determine non-dispositive matters that have been referred, subject to the exceptions found in 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A); and(3) To hear and make recommendations on dispositive matters that have been referred as defined in 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLOLCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, this court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding.By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 8/29/19. Text Only Entry (rebsec)
August 28, 2019 Filing 16 CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #14 Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge. All parties do not consent. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Robert E. Blackburn. All future pleadings should be designated as 19-cv-02255-REB. (Text Only Entry) (tsher, )
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MINUTE ORDER re: #14 Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge filed by Tatiana Buscaino by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 8/28/2019. Parties do not consent. The Court directs the Clerk of the Court to reassign this case under D.C. Colo. LCivR 40.1(a). (tsher, )
August 28, 2019 Filing 14 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Plaintiff Tatiana Buscaino All parties do not consent.. (Raykin, Igor)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 8/20/2019. #12 Response to Order to Show Cause filed by George Barolsky is discharged. Consent Form due by 9/4/2019. Scheduling Conference set for 9/23/2019 10:30 AM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. (tsher, )
August 19, 2019 Filing 12 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE , Dated August 9, 2019, Regarding Proof of Diversity of Citizenship and Jurisdiction re #8 by Defendant George Barolsky. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit of Defendant George Barolsky in Support of Defendant's Response to the Court's Show Cause Order, Dated August 9, 2019, Regarding Proof of Diversity of Citizenship and Jurisdiction)(Hamza, Olayinka)
August 14, 2019 Filing 11 Defendant George Barolsky's Affirmative Defenses and ANSWER to #3 Complaint by George Barolsky.(Hamza, Olayinka)
August 9, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Olayinka L. Hamza on behalf of George Barolsky (Hamza, Olayinka)
August 9, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Igor Raykin on behalf of Tatiana BuscainoAttorney Igor Raykin added to party Tatiana Buscaino(pty:pla) (Raykin, Igor)
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 DISCHARGED ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 8/9/2019 returnable by Defendant George Barolsky as to why the Court should not remand this case (or recommend that it be remanded) for Defendants failure to show complete diversity of citizenship pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1332 in the Notice of Removal. Show Cause Response due by 8/19/2019. (tsher, ) Modified on 8/20/2019 #13 Minute Order (tsher, ).
August 7, 2019 Filing 7 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (cmadr, )
August 7, 2019 Filing 6 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Text Only Entry. (cmadr, )
August 7, 2019 Filing 5 FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawls of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (cmadr, )
August 7, 2019 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons, Complaint upon George Barolsky on 23 July, 2019, filed by Plaintiff Tatiana Buscaino (cmadr, )
August 7, 2019 Filing 3 Verified COMPLAINT, Request for Injunctive Relief and Jury Demand against George Barolsky, filed by Tatiana Buscaino.(cmadr, )
August 7, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Filing of State Court Records Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1446(a) and D.C.Colo.LCivR 81.1 by Defendant George Barolsky (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Notice of Filing of State Court Records Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1446(a) and D.C.Colo.LCivR 81.1)(Hamza, Olayinka)
August 7, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by George Barolsky from District Court, Arapahoe County, Colorado, Case Number 2019CV31721. (Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number 1082-6831988), filed by George Barolsky. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B to Notice of Remova, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C to Notice of Remova, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D to Notice of Remova, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E to Notice of Remova, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F to Notice of Remova)(Hamza, Olayinka)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Buscaino v. Barolsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tatiana Buscaino
Represented By: Igor Raykin
Represented By: Michael Jeffrey Nolt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George Barolsky
Represented By: Olayinka L. Hamza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?