Verch v. Chapel Hills Vision, P.C.
Plaintiff: Marco Verch
3Rd Party Plaintiff: Chapel Hills Vision, P.C.
3Rd Party Defendant: MH Sub I, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv02286
Filed: August 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Lewis T Babcock
Referring Judge: Scott T Varholak
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 3, 2019 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Chapel Hills Vision, P.C.. MH Sub I, LLC served on 9/25/2019, answer due 10/16/2019. (Milgrom, Amanda)
October 3, 2019 Filing 15 AFFIDAVIT of Proof of Service of Third Party Complaint by ThirdParty Plaintiff Chapel Hills Vision, P.C.. (Milgrom, Amanda)
September 19, 2019 Filing 14 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (jgonz, )
September 19, 2019 Filing 13 SUMMONS REQUEST as to MH SUB I, LLC by ThirdParty Plaintiff Chapel Hills Vision, P.C.. (Milgrom, Amanda)
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER In light of the filing of #11 Third Party Complaint, the Scheduling Conference set for 10/17/2019 11:00 AM is VACATED and RESET for 11/14/2019 09:00 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. The parties shall file the Election Concerning Consent/Non-Consent to United States Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form on or before 10/31/2019, and shall submit a joint proposed scheduling Order on or before 11/07/2019. SO ORDERED, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 9/16/2019. Text Only Entry (stvlc1, )
September 16, 2019 Filing 11 AMENDED ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand, First THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against MH Sub I, LLC by ThirdParty Defendant MH Sub I, LLC. (Milgrom, Amanda)
September 6, 2019 Filing 10 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Milgrom, Amanda)
September 6, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, Attorney Amanda Levin Milgrom added to party Chapel Hills Vision, P.C.(pty:dft) by Chapel Hills Vision, P.C..(Milgrom, Amanda)
August 17, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Marco Verch. Chapel Hills Vision, P.C. served on 8/16/2019, answer due 9/6/2019. (Liebowitz, Richard)
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 10/17/2019 11:00 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Consent Form due by 10/3/2019. Proposed Scheduling Order due 10/10/2019, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 8/15/2019. (jgonz, )
August 14, 2019 Filing 6 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (angar, ) Modified on 8/19/2019 to correct document (angar, ).
August 14, 2019 Filing 5 MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE, by Senior Judge Lewis T. Babcock. This case is randomly returned to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak for all further proceedings. All future pleadings should be designated as 19-cv2286-STV (angar, )
August 12, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (rvill, )
August 12, 2019 Filing 3 Case assigned to Judge Lewis T. Babcock and drawn to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. Text Only Entry. (rvill, )
August 12, 2019 Filing 2 Report re Copyright: Report on the filing of an action emailed separately to the Director of the Copyright Office. (rvill, )
August 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Chapel Hills Vision, P.C. (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6836580)Attorney Richard Liebowitz added to party Marco Verch(pty:pla), filed by Marco Verch. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Summons, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Copyright Form)(Liebowitz, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Verch v. Chapel Hills Vision, P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Chapel Hills Vision, P.C.
Represented By: Amanda L. Milgrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marco Verch
Represented By: Richard Liebowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: MH Sub I, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?