Blooming Bellies Fitness v. North Bay Holistic Wellness Group, LLC
Plaintiff: BLOOMING BELLIES FITNESS
Defendant: NORTH BAY HOLISTIC WELLNESS GROUP, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv02295
Filed: August 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Kristen L Mix
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:44
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 2, 2019 Filing 15 Defendant's ANSWER to #1 Complaint, , COUNTERCLAIM against Blooming Bellies Fitness by North Bay Holistic Wellness Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - 2017 Instagram Luna, #2 Exhibit B - Termination email chaim, #3 Exhibit C - Training Permission, #4 Exhibit D 2017 - 2019 Luna Color Scheme, #5 Exhibit E 2016 - 2019 Bloom Color Scheme 2)(Howard, Thomas)
October 2, 2019 Filing 14 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Brenner, Scott)
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 9/10/19 GRANTING #8 Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond. North Bay Holistic Wellness Group, LLC answer due on or before 10/2/2019.(nmarb, )
September 10, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Thomas P. Howard on behalf of North Bay Holistic Wellness Group, LLCAttorney Thomas P. Howard added to party North Bay Holistic Wellness Group, LLC(pty:dft) (Howard, Thomas)
September 10, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Theodore E. Laszlo, Jr on behalf of Blooming Bellies FitnessAttorney Theodore E. Laszlo, Jr added to party Blooming Bellies Fitness(pty:pla) (Laszlo, Theodore)
September 10, 2019 Filing 10 RESPONSE to #8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond filed by Plaintiff Blooming Bellies Fitness. (Laszlo, Michael)
September 10, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Blooming Bellies Fitness. North Bay Holistic Wellness Group, LLC served on 8/21/2019, answer due 9/11/2019. (Laszlo, Michael)
September 9, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond by Defendant North Bay Holistic Wellness Group, LLC. (Cuneo, Kammie)
August 27, 2019 Filing 7 Utility Setting/Resetting Deadlines/Hearings: Text Only Entry Consent Form due by 10/23/2019, pursuant to 5 Minute Order. (nmarb, )
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 8/27/19 Setting Scheduling/Planning Conference. Proposed Scheduling Order due on or before 10/30/2019. Scheduling/Planning Conference set for 11/6/2019 11:00 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1, #2 Attachment 2) (nmarb, )
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER. Pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1(c)(4), the deadline to file the Consent/Non-Consent to United States Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form [#4-1] is October 23, 2019. by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 8/27/2019. Text Only Entry (klmlc1, )
August 13, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (rsams, )
August 12, 2019 Filing 3 Report re Patent/Trademark: Report on the filing of an action emailed (NEF) to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (rsams, )
August 12, 2019 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. Text Only Entry. (rsams, )
August 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against NORTH BAY HOLISTIC WELLNESS GROUP, LLC (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6838187)Attorney Michael Jacob Laszlo added to party BLOOMING BELLIES FITNESS(pty:pla), filed by BLOOMING BELLIES FITNESS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6A, #7 Exhibit 6B, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Civil Cover Sheet, #13 Summons)(Laszlo, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Blooming Bellies Fitness v. North Bay Holistic Wellness Group, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BLOOMING BELLIES FITNESS
Represented By: Michael Jacob Laszlo
Represented By: Theodore E. Laszlo, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NORTH BAY HOLISTIC WELLNESS GROUP, LLC
Represented By: Scott E. Brenner
Represented By: Thomas P. Howard
Represented By: Kammie Cuneo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?