Fong v. Coors et al
Plaintiff: Gary Fong
Defendant: Betty K. Devita, Iain J.G. Napier, Tracey I Joubert, Louis Vachon, H. Sanford Riley, Douglas D. Tough, Andrew T. Molson, Mark R Hunter, Charles M. Herington, Molson Coors Brewing Company, Geoffrey E. Molson, Roger G. Eaton, Peter J Coors, Franklin W. Hobbs, Mary Lynn Ferguson-McHugh and Peter H. Coors
Case Number: 1:2019cv02298
Filed: August 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Daniel D Domenico
Referring Judge: Nina Y Wang
Nature of Suit: Securities, Commodities, Exchange
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 78
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2019 Filing 23 Civil Case Admiratively Closed pursuant to 22 Order. Text Only Entry (athom, )
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER by Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 09/23/2019. No party has objected to the recommended stay and administrative closure of this case, and the time to do so has expired. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(b)(2); see also Summers v. State of Utah, 927 F.2d 1165, 1167 (10th Cir. 1991) ("In the absence of a timely objection, the district court may review a magistrate's report under any standard it deems appropriate."). The Court has reviewed the record and the recommendation, and finds that the recommended procedure invites no error and will afford the parties a full and fair opportunity to litigate their positions. Accordingly, the Court ADOPTS the Recommendation of the United States Magistrate Judge (Doc. #20 ) and GRANTS the parties' stipulated motion to stay this action (Doc. #13 ). This case shall be ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED. The parties are given leave to reopen for good cause, including, but not limited to, entry of an order resolving the anticipated motion to dismiss in the related Molson Coors Securities Actions listed on the second page of the Recommendation, or if a plaintiff in any related derivative lawsuit refuses to agree to a stay under similar terms. Text Only Entry (athom, )
September 6, 2019 Filing 21 COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ORDER for Telephonic Status Conference held on 9/6/2019 before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Discussion held regarding the Stipulated Motion to Stay Action #13 ... Neither side is opposed to administrative closure of this matter. FTR: Courtroom A-502. (bwilk, )
September 6, 2019 Filing 20 RECOMMENDATION OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 9/6/19 re #13 Stipulated MOTION to Stay filed by Gary Fong. It is respectfully RECOMMENDED that: The Parties Stipulated Motion to Stay Action [#13] be GRANTED; and that this action be ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED, with leave to reopen for good cause, including but not limited to entry of an order resolving the anticipated motion to dismiss in the related Molson Coors Securities Actions or if a plaintiff in any related derivative lawsuit refuses to agree to a stay under similar terms. It is ORDERED that the Scheduling Conference set for 10/21/19 at 11:00 am is VACATED.. (nmarb, )
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 8/4/19. Pending before this court is the Stipulated Motion to Stay #13 filed on August 20, 2019. A Telephonic Status Conference is SET for Friday, September 6, 2019 at 3 p.m. The Parties shall initiate the Status Conference by calling the chambers of Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang at (303) 335-2600 at the scheduled time. Text Only Entry (nmarb, )
August 21, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Angela Marie Liu on behalf of All Defendants Attorney Angela Marie Liu added to party Peter H. Coors(pty:dft), Attorney Angela Marie Liu added to party Peter J Coors(pty:dft), Attorney Angela Marie Liu added to party Betty K. Devita(pty:dft), Attorney Angela Marie Liu added to party Roger G. Eaton(pty:dft), Attorney Angela Marie Liu added to party Mary Lynn Ferguson-McHugh(pty:dft), Attorney Angela Marie Liu added to party Charles M. Herington(pty:dft), Attorney Angela Marie Liu added to party Franklin W. Hobbs(pty:dft), Attorney Angela Marie Liu added to party Mark R Hunter(pty:dft), Attorney Angela Marie Liu added to party Tracey I Joubert(pty:dft), Attorney Angela Marie Liu added to party Andrew T. Molson(pty:dft), Attorney Angela Marie Liu added to party Geoffrey E. Molson(pty:dft), Attorney Angela Marie Liu added to party Molson Coors Brewing Company(pty:dft), Attorney Angela Marie Liu added to party Iain J.G. Napier(pty:dft), Attorney Angela Marie Liu added to party H. Sanford Riley(pty:dft), Attorney Angela Marie Liu added to party Douglas D. Tough(pty:dft), Attorney Angela Marie Liu added to party Louis Vachon(pty:dft) (Liu, Angela)
August 21, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by David H. Kistenbroker on behalf of All Defendants Attorney David H. Kistenbroker added to party Peter H. Coors(pty:dft), Attorney David H. Kistenbroker added to party Peter J Coors(pty:dft), Attorney David H. Kistenbroker added to party Betty K. Devita(pty:dft), Attorney David H. Kistenbroker added to party Roger G. Eaton(pty:dft), Attorney David H. Kistenbroker added to party Mary Lynn Ferguson-McHugh(pty:dft), Attorney David H. Kistenbroker added to party Charles M. Herington(pty:dft), Attorney David H. Kistenbroker added to party Franklin W. Hobbs(pty:dft), Attorney David H. Kistenbroker added to party Mark R Hunter(pty:dft), Attorney David H. Kistenbroker added to party Tracey I Joubert(pty:dft), Attorney David H. Kistenbroker added to party Andrew T. Molson(pty:dft), Attorney David H. Kistenbroker added to party Geoffrey E. Molson(pty:dft), Attorney David H. Kistenbroker added to party Molson Coors Brewing Company(pty:dft), Attorney David H. Kistenbroker added to party Iain J.G. Napier(pty:dft), Attorney David H. Kistenbroker added to party H. Sanford Riley(pty:dft), Attorney David H. Kistenbroker added to party Douglas D. Tough(pty:dft), Attorney David H. Kistenbroker added to party Louis Vachon(pty:dft) (Kistenbroker, David)
August 21, 2019 Filing 16 ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES: re: #10 Notice of Entry of Appearance, filed by attorney Joni Sue Jacobsen. The format for the attorneys signature block is not correct. DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. Action to take - future documents must be filed pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 5.1(a) and 4.3(d) of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil Cases). (Text Only Entry) (athom, )
August 21, 2019 Filing 15 ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES: re: #9 Notice of Entry of Appearance, #11 Notice of Entry of Appearance, filed by attorney David H. Kistenbroker; Angela Marie Liu. Attorneys have failed to comply with D.C.COLO.LCivR5.1(a) and 4.3(d) of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil Cases), which mandate the correct form for an attorneys signature block. These documents do not have a s/ signature and must be re-filed. (Text Only Entry) (athom, )
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER REFERRING MOTION: #13 Stipulated MOTION to Stay filed by Gary Fong. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang by Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 8/21/2019. Text Only Entry (dddlc3, )
August 20, 2019 Filing 13 Stipulated MOTION to Stay by Plaintiff Gary Fong. (Wood, Paul)
August 20, 2019 Filing 12 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Jacobsen, Joni)
August 20, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Angela Marie Liu on behalf of All Defendants Attorney Angela Marie Liu added to party Peter H. Coors(pty:dft), Attorney Angela Marie Liu added to party Peter J Coors(pty:dft), Attorney Angela Marie Liu added to party Betty K. Devita(pty:dft), Attorney Angela Marie Liu added to party Roger G. Eaton(pty:dft), Attorney Angela Marie Liu added to party Mary Lynn Ferguson-McHugh(pty:dft), Attorney Angela Marie Liu added to party Charles M. Herington(pty:dft), Attorney Angela Marie Liu added to party Franklin W. Hobbs(pty:dft), Attorney Angela Marie Liu added to party Mark R Hunter(pty:dft), Attorney Angela Marie Liu added to party Tracey I Joubert(pty:dft), Attorney Angela Marie Liu added to party Andrew T. Molson(pty:dft), Attorney Angela Marie Liu added to party Geoffrey E. Molson(pty:dft), Attorney Angela Marie Liu added to party Molson Coors Brewing Company(pty:dft), Attorney Angela Marie Liu added to party Iain J.G. Napier(pty:dft), Attorney Angela Marie Liu added to party H. Sanford Riley(pty:dft), Attorney Angela Marie Liu added to party Douglas D. Tough(pty:dft), Attorney Angela Marie Liu added to party Louis Vachon(pty:dft) (Liu, Angela)
August 20, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Joni Sue Jacobsen on behalf of All Defendants Attorney Joni Sue Jacobsen added to party Peter H. Coors(pty:dft), Attorney Joni Sue Jacobsen added to party Peter J Coors(pty:dft), Attorney Joni Sue Jacobsen added to party Betty K. Devita(pty:dft), Attorney Joni Sue Jacobsen added to party Roger G. Eaton(pty:dft), Attorney Joni Sue Jacobsen added to party Mary Lynn Ferguson-McHugh(pty:dft), Attorney Joni Sue Jacobsen added to party Charles M. Herington(pty:dft), Attorney Joni Sue Jacobsen added to party Franklin W. Hobbs(pty:dft), Attorney Joni Sue Jacobsen added to party Mark R Hunter(pty:dft), Attorney Joni Sue Jacobsen added to party Tracey I Joubert(pty:dft), Attorney Joni Sue Jacobsen added to party Andrew T. Molson(pty:dft), Attorney Joni Sue Jacobsen added to party Geoffrey E. Molson(pty:dft), Attorney Joni Sue Jacobsen added to party Molson Coors Brewing Company(pty:dft), Attorney Joni Sue Jacobsen added to party Iain J.G. Napier(pty:dft), Attorney Joni Sue Jacobsen added to party H. Sanford Riley(pty:dft), Attorney Joni Sue Jacobsen added to party Douglas D. Tough(pty:dft), Attorney Joni Sue Jacobsen added to party Louis Vachon(pty:dft) (Jacobsen, Joni)
August 20, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by David H. Kistenbroker on behalf of All Defendants Attorney David H. Kistenbroker added to party Peter H. Coors(pty:dft), Attorney David H. Kistenbroker added to party Peter J Coors(pty:dft), Attorney David H. Kistenbroker added to party Betty K. Devita(pty:dft), Attorney David H. Kistenbroker added to party Roger G. Eaton(pty:dft), Attorney David H. Kistenbroker added to party Mary Lynn Ferguson-McHugh(pty:dft), Attorney David H. Kistenbroker added to party Charles M. Herington(pty:dft), Attorney David H. Kistenbroker added to party Franklin W. Hobbs(pty:dft), Attorney David H. Kistenbroker added to party Mark R Hunter(pty:dft), Attorney David H. Kistenbroker added to party Tracey I Joubert(pty:dft), Attorney David H. Kistenbroker added to party Andrew T. Molson(pty:dft), Attorney David H. Kistenbroker added to party Geoffrey E. Molson(pty:dft), Attorney David H. Kistenbroker added to party Molson Coors Brewing Company(pty:dft), Attorney David H. Kistenbroker added to party Iain J.G. Napier(pty:dft), Attorney David H. Kistenbroker added to party H. Sanford Riley(pty:dft), Attorney David H. Kistenbroker added to party Douglas D. Tough(pty:dft), Attorney David H. Kistenbroker added to party Louis Vachon(pty:dft) (Kistenbroker, David)
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Setting Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference. Scheduling Conference set for 10/21/2019 11:00 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang, by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 8/19/19. (morti, )
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of Local Civ. R. 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, (4) conduct hearings, including evidentiary hearings, and submit proposed findings of fact and recommendations for rulings on dispositive motions, and (5) pursuant to Local Civ. R. 16.6 and at the discretion of the Magistrate Judge, convene such early neutral evaluation and/or settlement conferences and direct related procedures as may facilitate resolution of this case without the necessity of a motion or prior authorization of the undersigned. SO ORDERED by Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 8/14/2019. Text Only Entry (dddlc3, )
August 13, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONSES issued by Clerk. (athom, )
August 13, 2019 Filing 5 MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE by Senior Judge Blackburn. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Daniel D. Domenico. All future pleadings should be designated as 19-cv-02298-DDD. (athom, )
August 13, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Defendants and Nominal Defendant by Plaintiff Gary Fong. (Attachments: #1 Summons - Peter J. Coors, #2 Summons - Geoffrey E. Molson, #3 Summons - Andrew T. Molson, #4 Summons - Mark R. Hunter, #5 Summons - Betty K. Davita, #6 Summons - Mary Lynn Ferguson-McHugh, #7 Summons - Franklin W. Hobbs, #8 Summons - Iain J.G. Napier, #9 Summons - Douglas D. Tough, #10 Summons - Louis Vachon, #11 Summons - Roger G. Eaton, #12 Summons - H. Sanford Riley, #13 Summons Charles M. Herington, #14 Summons Tracey I. Joubert, #15 Summons Molson Coors Brewing Company)(Wood, Paul)
August 12, 2019 Filing 3 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). No Summons Issued. Summonses must list all parties in the caption. Please file completed summons for issuance using the event Summons Request. (cmadr, )
August 12, 2019 Filing 2 Case assigned to Judge Robert E. Blackburn and drawn to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Text Only Entry. (cmadr, )
August 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Peter H. Coors, Peter J Coors, Betty K. Devita, Roger G. Eaton, Mary Lynn Ferguson-McHugh, Charles M. Herington, Franklin W. Hobbs, Mark R Hunter, Tracey I Joubert, Andrew T. Molson, Geoffrey E. Molson, Molson Coors Brewing Company, Iain J.G. Napier, H. Sanford Riley, Douglas D. Tough, Louis Vachon (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6838452)Attorney Paul R. Wood added to party Gary Fong(pty:pla), filed by Gary Fong. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons - Defendants, #3 Summons - Nominal Defendant)(Wood, Paul)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fong v. Coors et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Betty K. Devita
Represented By: Joni Sue Jacobsen
Represented By: David H. Kistenbroker
Represented By: Angela Marie Liu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Iain J.G. Napier
Represented By: Joni Sue Jacobsen
Represented By: David H. Kistenbroker
Represented By: Angela Marie Liu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tracey I Joubert
Represented By: Joni Sue Jacobsen
Represented By: David H. Kistenbroker
Represented By: Angela Marie Liu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Louis Vachon
Represented By: Joni Sue Jacobsen
Represented By: David H. Kistenbroker
Represented By: Angela Marie Liu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H. Sanford Riley
Represented By: Joni Sue Jacobsen
Represented By: David H. Kistenbroker
Represented By: Angela Marie Liu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Douglas D. Tough
Represented By: Joni Sue Jacobsen
Represented By: David H. Kistenbroker
Represented By: Angela Marie Liu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew T. Molson
Represented By: Joni Sue Jacobsen
Represented By: David H. Kistenbroker
Represented By: Angela Marie Liu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark R Hunter
Represented By: Joni Sue Jacobsen
Represented By: David H. Kistenbroker
Represented By: Angela Marie Liu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles M. Herington
Represented By: Joni Sue Jacobsen
Represented By: David H. Kistenbroker
Represented By: Angela Marie Liu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Molson Coors Brewing Company
Represented By: Joni Sue Jacobsen
Represented By: David H. Kistenbroker
Represented By: Angela Marie Liu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Geoffrey E. Molson
Represented By: Joni Sue Jacobsen
Represented By: David H. Kistenbroker
Represented By: Angela Marie Liu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roger G. Eaton
Represented By: Joni Sue Jacobsen
Represented By: David H. Kistenbroker
Represented By: Angela Marie Liu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter J Coors
Represented By: Joni Sue Jacobsen
Represented By: David H. Kistenbroker
Represented By: Angela Marie Liu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Franklin W. Hobbs
Represented By: Joni Sue Jacobsen
Represented By: David H. Kistenbroker
Represented By: Angela Marie Liu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Lynn Ferguson-McHugh
Represented By: Joni Sue Jacobsen
Represented By: David H. Kistenbroker
Represented By: Angela Marie Liu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter H. Coors
Represented By: Joni Sue Jacobsen
Represented By: David H. Kistenbroker
Represented By: Angela Marie Liu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Fong
Represented By: Paul R. Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?