Martin et al v. Chinese Children Adoption International
Plaintiff: Barry (I) Martin, Barry Martin, Tammy (I) Martin and Tammy Martin
Defendant: Chinese Children Adoption International
Case Number: 1:2019cv02305
Filed: August 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Scott T Varholak
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1346t
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER OF REFERENCE. Pursuant to the consent of the parties to the jurisdiction of the magistrate judge #16 , this case is referred to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak for all purposes pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 10/4/19. Text Only Entry (pabsec)
October 3, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Annemarie C Alonso on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Annemarie C Alonso added to party Barry Martin(pty:pla), Attorney Annemarie C Alonso added to party Barry (I) Martin(pty:pla), Attorney Annemarie C Alonso added to party Tammy Martin(pty:pla), Attorney Annemarie C Alonso added to party Tammy (I) Martin(pty:pla) (Alonso, Annemarie)
October 3, 2019 Filing 16 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Plaintiffs Barry Martin, Barry (I) Martin, Tammy Martin, Tammy (I) Martin All parties consent.. (Morgan, Derrick)
September 27, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Courtney B. Kramer on behalf of Chinese Children Adoption InternationalAttorney Courtney B. Kramer added to party Chinese Children Adoption International(pty:dft) (Kramer, Courtney)
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Motion to Vacate. The Scheduling Conference set for 10/18/2019 10:00 AM is VACATED and RESET for 11/22/2019 10:30 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. The parties shall file the Election Concerning Consent/Non-Consent to United States Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form by 11/8/2019 and shall submit a joint Proposed Scheduling Order by 11/15/2019. SO ORDERED, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 9/27/2019. Text Only Entry(stvlc2, )
September 27, 2019 Filing 13 Unopposed MOTION to Vacate and Reset the Scheduling Conference by Defendant Chinese Children Adoption International. (Eddy, Jonathan)
September 16, 2019 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Tammy (I) Martin, Barry (I) Martin, Tammy Martin, Barry Martin. Chinese Children Adoption International waiver sent on 9/6/2019, answer due 11/5/2019. (Little, Jonathan)
August 23, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Chinese Children Adoption International served on 8/19/2019, answer due 9/9/2019. (Little, Jonathan)
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 10/18/2019 10:00 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Consent Form due by 10/4/2019. Proposed Scheduling Order due 10/11/2019, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 8/15/2019. (jgonz, )
August 13, 2019 Filing 9 Summons Issued. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (rvill, ) Modified to correct text entry on 8/14/2019 (rvill, ).
August 13, 2019 Filing 8 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Text Only Entry. (rvill, )
August 13, 2019 Filing 7 ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES re: #1 Complaint filed by attorney Derrick Dewayne Morgan, Jr. The s/signature did not match the filers name on the account for which the login and password are registered. DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. Action to take - future documents must be filed pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 5.1(a) and 4.3(c) of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases).(Text Only Entry) (rvill, )
August 13, 2019 Filing 6 Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number COX091566. Text Only Entry. (rvill, )
August 13, 2019 Filing 5 Administrative Notice: No filing fee received with case opening. Attorney contacted with instructions to submit filing fee within 3 hours. (Text Only Entry) (rvill, )
August 13, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Chinese Children Adoption International (CCAI) by Plaintiff Tammy Martin. (Little, Jonathan)
August 13, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance For All Plaintiffs by Derrick Dewayne Morgan, Jr on behalf of Tammy Martin (Morgan, Derrick)
August 13, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance for All Plaintiffs by Jonathan Charles Little on behalf of Tammy MartinAttorney Jonathan Charles Little added to party Tammy Martin(pty:pla) (Little, Jonathan)
August 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Tammy Martin against Chinese Children Adoption International (Filing fee $ 400).Attorney Derrick Dewayne Morgan, Jr added to party Tammy Martin(pty:pla), filed by Tammy Martin.(Morgan, Derrick)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Martin et al v. Chinese Children Adoption International
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barry (I) Martin
Represented By: Derrick Dewayne Morgan, Jr.
Represented By: Jonathan Charles Little
Represented By: Annemarie C Alonso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barry Martin
Represented By: Derrick Dewayne Morgan, Jr.
Represented By: Jonathan Charles Little
Represented By: Annemarie C Alonso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tammy (I) Martin
Represented By: Derrick Dewayne Morgan, Jr.
Represented By: Jonathan Charles Little
Represented By: Annemarie C Alonso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tammy Martin
Represented By: Derrick Dewayne Morgan, Jr.
Represented By: Jonathan Charles Little
Represented By: Annemarie C Alonso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chinese Children Adoption International
Represented By: Courtney B. Kramer
Represented By: Jonathan Neal Eddy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?