Brito v. HD Development of Maryland, Inc
Plaintiff: Carlos Brito
Defendant: HD Development of Maryland, Inc
Case Number: 1:2019cv02307
Filed: August 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Raymond P Moore
Referring Judge: Kathleen M Tafoya
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12181
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 SCHEDULING ORDER: By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 10/08/2019. (ksena)
October 8, 2019 Filing 19 COURTROOM MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya: Scheduling Conference held on 10/8/2019, ( Discovery due by 3/19/2020., Dispositive Motions due by 5/27/2020., Proposed Pretrial Order due by 6/15/2020., Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/22/2020 10:00 AM in Courtroom 101 (Colorado Springs) before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya.). FTR: COURTROOM 101. (ksena)
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MINUTE ORDER granting #16 Motion to Attend Scheduling Conference by Phone. Plaintiff may attend the Scheduling Conference by telephone by calling 719-575-0328 at the scheduled time. Counsel shall use a LAND LINE; NO CELLULAR, CORDLESS OR SPEAKER PHONES ARE PERMITTED. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 10/4/19. Text Only Entry(kmtlc1 )
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MEMORANDUM regarding #16 MOTION for Leave to Attend October 8, 2019 Scheduling Conference by Telephone #7 Order filed by Carlos Brito. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Entered by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 10/1/2019. (Text Only Entry) (rmsec )
October 1, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION for Leave to Attend October 8, 2019 Scheduling Conference by Telephone #7 Order by Plaintiff Carlos Brito. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Perez, Anthony)
October 1, 2019 Filing 15 Proposed Scheduling Order Proposed Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Carlos Brito. (Perez, Anthony)
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MINUTE ORDER: With the assignment of this matter, the parties are advised that throughout this case they are expected to be familiar and comply with not only the Local Rules of this District, but also Judge Raymond P. Moore's Civil Practice Standards, which may be found at: http://www.cod.uscourts.gov/JudicialOfficers/ActiveArticleIIIJudges/HonRaymondPMoore.aspx. SO ORDERED by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 9/17/2019. (Text Only Entry) (rmsec )
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, (4) conduct a pretrial conference and enter a pretrial order, and (5) conduct hearings, including evidentiary hearings, and submit proposed findings of fact and recommendations for rulings on dispositive motions. Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, this court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. Entered by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 9/17/2019. (Text Only Entry) (rmsec )
September 16, 2019 Filing 12 CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #11 Consent/Non-Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge. All parties do not consent. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Raymond P. Moore. All future pleadings should be designated as 19-cv-02307-RM. (Text Only Entry) (jgonz, )
September 16, 2019 Filing 11 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendant HD Development of Maryland, Inc All parties do not consent.. (Hurley, Gregory)
August 22, 2019 Filing 10 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Hurley, Gregory)
August 22, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, Attorney Gregory Francis Hurley added to party HD Development of Maryland, Inc(pty:dft) by HD Development of Maryland, Inc.(Hurley, Gregory)
August 16, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Carlos Brito. HD Development of Maryland, Inc served on 8/15/2019, answer due 9/5/2019. (Perez, Anthony)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 10/8/2019 11:00 AM in Courtroom 101 (Colorado Springs) before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Consent Form due by 10/1/2019. by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 08/14/2019. (ksena)
August 14, 2019 Filing 6 Administrative Notice: Duplicate filing fee received. Financial notified and a refund is pending. (Text Only Entry) (rvill, )
August 13, 2019 Filing 5 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (athom, )
August 13, 2019 Filing 4 MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE by Senior Judge Blackburn. This case is randomly reassigned to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. All future pleadings should be designated as 19-cv-02307-KMT. (athom, )
August 13, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (cmadr, )
August 13, 2019 Filing 2 Case assigned to Judge Robert E. Blackburn and drawn to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Text Only Entry. (cmadr, )
August 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against HD Development of Maryland, Inc (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6839990)Attorney Anthony J. Perez added to party Carlos Brito(pty:pla), filed by Carlos Brito. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Perez, Anthony)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brito v. HD Development of Maryland, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlos Brito
Represented By: Anthony J. Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HD Development of Maryland, Inc
Represented By: Gregory Francis Hurley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?