Merrill et al v. Contract Freighters, Inc.
Plaintiff: Orlando Lebron, Melanie Brown, Jose Limon, Chris Beaupre, Charles Tanksley, Christopher Zdenek, Jaime Parrales, Tami Potirala, Eduardo Sustaita, Sami Nasr, Elvrett Littlejohn, Becky Austin, Jeffrey Briggs, Donald Creasman, Larry Jurcak, Danny Lloyd, James Newberry, Anthony Dennis, Jose Garcia, Ronald Dennis, Terry Jones, Adam Heide, Duane Vanderkamp, Joey Brown, Anthony Glover, Keith Herring, Alexander Flanigan, Raynold Corneille, Craig Williams, Zigmund Gutowski, Tim Hollingsworth, Benjamin Johnson, Earnest Ward, Jr., Allen Cashman, Johnnie Wynne, Steven Kortman, Julian LaFranks, Gary Grubbs, Gerord Thomas, Franklin Merrill, Rodney Lacy, Eric Robertson, Eric Ard, Paula Horion, Turrell Sanders, Andre Ellis, Jessie Braxton, Jr., Joseph Horion and Jeffrey Biggs
Defendant: Transforce, Inc., Contract Freighers, Inc., XPO Logistics Truckload, Inc., Con-Way Truckload, Inc., Contract Freighters, Inc. and CFI
Case Number: 1:2019cv02309
Filed: August 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: S Kato Crews
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Resetting Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference. The parties contacted Chambers to requesting a new date for the Scheduling Conference due to a scheduling conflict. Accordingly, IT IS ORDERED that the Scheduling Conference is RESET for 12/3/2019 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. IT FURTHER ORDERED that the Proposed Scheduling Order and the Magistrate Judge Consent Form [ECF. #3 ] are due 11/26/2019. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 10/10/2019. Text Only Entry (skclc2)
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Setting Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference. The Scheduling Conference is set for 11/18/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. The parties shall file their proposed scheduling order, and email a copy in Word format to Crews_Chambers@cod.uscourts.gov, on or before 11/12/2019. The Magistrate Judge Consent Form (ECF. #3 ) is due 11/12/2019. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 9/16/2019. Text Only Entry (skclc2)
September 8, 2019 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Christopher Zdenek, Danny Lloyd, Eduardo Sustaita, Keith Herring, Paula Horion, Joseph Horion, Eric Ard, Turrell Sanders, Zigmund Gutowski, Benjamin Johnson, Jose Limon, Jeffrey Biggs, Gerord Thomas, Chris Beaupre, Tami Potirala, Adam Heide, Terry Jones, Becky Austin, Sami Nasr, Earnest Ward, Jr., Joey Brown, Ronald Dennis, Steven Kortman, Jose Garcia, Julian LaFranks, Jessie Braxton, Jr., Eric Robertson, James Newberry, Jaime Parrales, Anthony Glover, Donald Creasman, Gary Grubbs, Melanie Brown, Alexander Flanigan, Larry Jurcak, Raynold Corneille, Rodney Lacy, Johnnie Wynne, Craig Williams, Charles Tanksley, Anthony Dennis, Tim Hollingsworth, Duane Vanderkamp, Orlando Lebron, Elvrett Littlejohn, Andre Ellis, Allen Cashman, Franklin Merrill. Contract Freighters, Inc. waiver sent on 8/27/2019, answer due 10/28/2019. (Crone, John)
August 30, 2019 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Plaintiffs, filed by Christopher Zdenek, Danny Lloyd, Eduardo Sustaita, Keith Herring, Paula Horion, Joseph Horion, Eric Ard, Turrell Sanders, Zigmund Gutowski, Benjamin Johnson, Jose Limon, Jeffrey Biggs, Gerord Thomas, Chris Beaupre, Tami Potirala, Adam Heide, Terry Jones, Becky Austin, Sami Nasr, Earnest Ward, Jr., Joey Brown, Ronald Dennis, Steven Kortman, Jose Garcia, Julian LaFranks, Jessie Braxton, Jr., Eric Robertson, James Newberry, Jaime Parrales, Anthony Glover, Donald Creasman, Gary Grubbs, Melanie Brown, Alexander Flanigan, Larry Jurcak, Raynold Corneille, Rodney Lacy, Johnnie Wynne, Craig Williams, Charles Tanksley, Anthony Dennis, Tim Hollingsworth, Duane Vanderkamp, Orlando Lebron, Elvrett Littlejohn, Andre Ellis, Allen Cashman, Franklin Merrill.(Crone, John)
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER re: #6 Notice of Filing of First Amended Complaint. Plaintiffs filed their Notice [ECF. #4 ] pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 15(a)(1)(A). Plaintiffs are entitled to file their First Amended Complaint as a matter of course. They have not done so as of the date of this Order. Plaintiffs merely attached a redlined version of the First Amended Complaint to the Notice. [See ECF. #6-1.] This does not constitute a filing of the Amended Complaint. Accordingly, IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiffs shall file a clean copy of the First Amended Complaint by 8/30/2019. The Court's acceptance of the First Amended Complaint will be effective upon its filing. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 8/29/2019. Text Only Entry (skclc2)
August 27, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Filing Amended Pleading by Plaintiffs Eric Ard, Becky Austin, Chris Beaupre, Jeffrey Biggs, Jessie Braxton, Jr., Joey Brown, Melanie Brown, Allen Cashman, Raynold Corneille, Donald Creasman, Anthony Dennis, Ronald Dennis, Andre Ellis, Alexander Flanigan, Jose Garcia, Anthony Glover, Gary Grubbs, Zigmund Gutowski, Adam Heide, Keith Herring, Tim Hollingsworth, Joseph Horion, Paula Horion, Benjamin Johnson, Terry Jones, Larry Jurcak, Steven Kortman, Julian LaFranks, Rodney Lacy, Orlando Lebron, Jose Limon, Elvrett Littlejohn, Danny Lloyd, Franklin Merrill, Sami Nasr, James Newberry, Jaime Parrales, Tami Potirala, Eric Robertson, Turrell Sanders, Eduardo Sustaita, Charles Tanksley, Gerord Thomas, Duane Vanderkamp, Earnest Ward, Jr., Craig Williams, Johnnie Wynne, Christopher Zdenek (Attachments: #1 Exhibit First Amended Complaint and Jury Demand)(Crone, John)
August 27, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF CASE ASSOCIATION by John Reily Crone on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Crone, John)
August 27, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Change of Address/Contact Information by John Reily Crone (Crone, John)
August 13, 2019 Filing 3 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. No Summons Issued. (cmadr, )
August 13, 2019 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. Text Only Entry. (cmadr, )
August 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6840145)Attorney John Reily Crone added to party Eric Ard(pty:pla), Attorney John Reily Crone added to party Becky Austin(pty:pla), Attorney John Reily Crone added to party Chris Beaupre(pty:pla), Attorney John Reily Crone added to party Jessie Braxton, Jr.(pty:pla), Attorney John Reily Crone added to party Jeffrey Briggs(pty:pla), Attorney John Reily Crone added to party Joey Brown(pty:pla), Attorney John Reily Crone added to party Melanie Brown(pty:pla), Attorney John Reily Crone added to party Allen Cashman(pty:pla), Attorney John Reily Crone added to party Raynold Corneille(pty:pet), Attorney John Reily Crone added to party Donald Creasman(pty:pla), Attorney John Reily Crone added to party Anthony Dennis(pty:pla), Attorney John Reily Crone added to party Ronald Dennis(pty:pla), Attorney John Reily Crone added to party Andre Ellis(pty:pla), Attorney John Reily Crone added to party Alexander Flanigan(pty:pla), Attorney John Reily Crone added to party Jose Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney John Reily Crone added to party Anthony Glover(pty:pla), Attorney John Reily Crone added to party Gary Grubbs(pty:pla), Attorney John Reily Crone added to party Zigmund Gutowski(pty:pla), Attorney John Reily Crone added to party Adam Heide(pty:pla), Attorney John Reily Crone added to party Keith Herring(pty:pla), Attorney John Reily Crone added to party Tim Hollingsworth(pty:pla), Attorney John Reily Crone added to party Joseph Horion(pty:pla), Attorney John Reily Crone added to party Paula Horion (pty:pla), Attorney John Reily Crone added to party Benjamin Johnson(pty:pla), Attorney John Reily Crone added to party Terry Jones(pty:pla), Attorney John Reily Crone added to party Larry Jurcak(pty:pla), Attorney John Reily Crone added to party Steven Kortman(pty:pla), Attorney John Reily Crone added to party Julian LaFranks(pty:pla), Attorney John Reily Crone added to party Rodney Lacy(pty:pla), Attorney John Reily Crone added to party Orlando Lebron(pty:pla), Attorney John Reily Crone added to party Jose Limon(pty:pla), Attorney John Reily Crone added to party Elvrett Littlejohn(pty:pla), Attorney John Reily Crone added to party Danny Lloyd(pty:pla), Attorney John Reily Crone added to party Franklin Merrill(pty:pla), Attorney John Reily Crone added to party Sami Nasr(pty:pla), Attorney John Reily Crone added to party James Newberry(pty:pla), Attorney John Reily Crone added to party Jaime Parrales(pty:pla), Attorney John Reily Crone added to party Tami Potirala(pty:pla), Attorney John Reily Crone added to party Eric Robertson(pty:pla), Attorney John Reily Crone added to party Turrell Sanders(pty:pla), Attorney John Reily Crone added to party Eduardo Sustaita(pty:pla), Attorney John Reily Crone added to party Charles Tanksley(pty:pla), Attorney John Reily Crone added to party Gerord Thomas(pty:pla), Attorney John Reily Crone added to party Duane Vanderkamp(pty:pla), Attorney John Reily Crone added to party Earnest Ward, Jr.(pty:pla), Attorney John Reily Crone added to party Craig Williams(pty:pla), Attorney John Reily Crone added to party Johnnie Wynne(pty:pla), Attorney John Reily Crone added to party Christopher Zdenek(pty:pla), filed by Christopher Zdenek, Danny Lloyd, Eduardo Sustaita, Keith Herring, Paula Horion, Joseph Horion, Eric Ard, Turrell Sanders, Zigmund Gutowski, Benjamin Johnson, Jose Limon, Jeffrey Briggs, Gerord Thomas, Chris Beaupre, Tami Potirala, Adam Heide, Terry Jones, Becky Austin, Sami Nasr, Earnest Ward, Jr., Joey Brown, Ronald Dennis, Steven Kortman, Jose Garcia, Julian LaFranks, Jessie Braxton, Jr., Eric Robertson, James Newberry, Jaime Parrales, Anthony Glover, Donald Creasman, Gary Grubbs, Melanie Brown, Alexander Flanigan, Larry Jurcak, Raynold Corneille, Rodney Lacy, Johnnie Wynne, Craig Williams, Charles Tanksley, Anthony Dennis, Tim Hollingsworth, Duane Vanderkamp, Orlando Lebron, Elvrett Littlejohn, Andre Ellis, Allen Cashman, Franklin Merrill. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Crone, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Merrill et al v. Contract Freighters, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Orlando Lebron
Represented By: John Reily Crone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melanie Brown
Represented By: John Reily Crone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Limon
Represented By: John Reily Crone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chris Beaupre
Represented By: John Reily Crone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Tanksley
Represented By: John Reily Crone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Zdenek
Represented By: John Reily Crone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jaime Parrales
Represented By: John Reily Crone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tami Potirala
Represented By: John Reily Crone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eduardo Sustaita
Represented By: John Reily Crone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sami Nasr
Represented By: John Reily Crone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elvrett Littlejohn
Represented By: John Reily Crone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Becky Austin
Represented By: John Reily Crone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Briggs
Represented By: John Reily Crone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Creasman
Represented By: John Reily Crone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Jurcak
Represented By: John Reily Crone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danny Lloyd
Represented By: John Reily Crone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Newberry
Represented By: John Reily Crone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Dennis
Represented By: John Reily Crone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Garcia
Represented By: John Reily Crone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Dennis
Represented By: John Reily Crone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terry Jones
Represented By: John Reily Crone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adam Heide
Represented By: John Reily Crone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Duane Vanderkamp
Represented By: John Reily Crone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joey Brown
Represented By: John Reily Crone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Glover
Represented By: John Reily Crone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keith Herring
Represented By: John Reily Crone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexander Flanigan
Represented By: John Reily Crone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raynold Corneille
Represented By: John Reily Crone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Craig Williams
Represented By: John Reily Crone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zigmund Gutowski
Represented By: John Reily Crone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tim Hollingsworth
Represented By: John Reily Crone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benjamin Johnson
Represented By: John Reily Crone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Earnest Ward, Jr.
Represented By: John Reily Crone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allen Cashman
Represented By: John Reily Crone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Johnnie Wynne
Represented By: John Reily Crone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Kortman
Represented By: John Reily Crone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julian LaFranks
Represented By: John Reily Crone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Grubbs
Represented By: John Reily Crone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerord Thomas
Represented By: John Reily Crone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Franklin Merrill
Represented By: John Reily Crone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rodney Lacy
Represented By: John Reily Crone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Robertson
Represented By: John Reily Crone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Ard
Represented By: John Reily Crone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paula Horion
Represented By: John Reily Crone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Turrell Sanders
Represented By: John Reily Crone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andre Ellis
Represented By: John Reily Crone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessie Braxton, Jr.
Represented By: John Reily Crone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Horion
Represented By: John Reily Crone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Biggs
Represented By: John Reily Crone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Transforce, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Contract Freighers, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XPO Logistics Truckload, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Con-Way Truckload, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Contract Freighters, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CFI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?