USA v. $69,375.00 in United States Currency et al
Plaintiff: USA
Defendant: $22,036.00 in United States Currency, $5,294.00 in United States Currency, $3,100.00 in United States Currency, 15725 E. 97th Avenue, Commerce City, Colorado, $5,044.00 in United States Currency, $14,998.00 in United States Currency, 385 Matsuno Street, Brighton, Colorado, Mens Rolex Oyster Perpetual Date Watch, $8,120.00 in United States Currency, 674 Wind Rower Court, Brighton, Colorado, 2016 Lexus GX 460, VIN: JTJBM7FX9G5145879, $2,340.00 in United States Currency, $5,154.00 in United States Currency, $8,101.00 in United States Currency, $69,375.00 in United States Currency, $15,110.00 in United States Currency, $9,715.00 in United States Currency, 10908 Unity Lane, Commerce City, Colorado, 370 Clubhouse Drive, Fort Lupton, Colorado, 2014 Honda CRV VIN: 3CZRM3H33EG710843, 2015 Lexus RX 350 VIN: JTJZK1BA6F2422782, $3,332.00 in United States Currency, 14358 Glenayre Circle, Parker, Colorado, $4,000.00 in United States Currency, 11425 Helena Street, Commerce City, Colorado and 3428 Purcell Street, Brighton, Colorado
Case Number: 1:2019cv02313
Filed: August 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: N Reid Neureiter
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:881
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER OF REFERENCE. Pursuant to the consent of the parties to the jurisdiction of the magistrate judge #18 , this case is referred to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter for all purposes pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 9/13/19. Text Only Entry (pabsec)
September 12, 2019 Filing 18 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Plaintiff USA All parties consent.. (Young, Elizabeth)
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 8/15/2019. Consent Form due by 10/8/2019. Status Conference set for 10/22/2019 10:00 AM in Courtroom C205 before Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. (tsher, )
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Restrict by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 8/15/2019.(tsher, )
August 14, 2019 Filing 15 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (angar, )
August 14, 2019 Filing 14 MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE, by Senior Judge Lewis T. Babcock. This case is randomly returned to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter for all further proceedings. All future pleadings should be designated as 19-cv-2313-NRN (angar, )
August 14, 2019 Filing 13 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (rvill, )
August 13, 2019 Filing 12 Case assigned to Judge Lewis T. Babcock and drawn to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. Text Only Entry. (rvill, )
August 13, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Lis Pendens 370 Clubhouse Drive, Fort Lupton, Colorado by Plaintiff USA (Young, Elizabeth)
August 13, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Lis Pendens 385 Matsuno Street, Brighton, Colorado by Plaintiff USA (Young, Elizabeth)
August 13, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Lis Pendens 15725 E. 97th Avenue, Commerce City, Colorado by Plaintiff USA (Young, Elizabeth)
August 13, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Lis Pendens 11425 Helena Street, Commerce City, Colorado by Plaintiff USA (Young, Elizabeth)
August 13, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Lis Pendens 674 Wind Rower Court, Brighton, Colorado by Plaintiff USA (Young, Elizabeth)
August 13, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Lis Pendens 14358 Glenayre Circle, Parker, Colorado by Plaintiff USA (Young, Elizabeth)
August 13, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Lis Pendens 3428 Purcell Street, Brighton, Colorado by Plaintiff USA (Young, Elizabeth)
August 13, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Lis Pendens 10908 Unity Lane, Commerce City, Colorado by Plaintiff USA (Young, Elizabeth)
August 13, 2019 Filing 3 RESTRICTED DOCUMENT - Level 2: by Plaintiff USA.. (Young, Elizabeth)
August 13, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Restrict by Plaintiff USA. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Young, Elizabeth)
August 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR FORFEITURE IN REM against $14,998.00 in United States Currency, $15,110.00 in United States Currency, $2,340.00 in United States Currency, $22,036.00 in United States Currency, $3,100.00 in United States Currency, $3,332.00 in United States Currency, $4,000.00 in United States Currency, $5,044.00 in United States Currency, $5,154.00 in United States Currency, $5,294.00 in United States Currency, $69,375.00 in United States Currency, $8,101.00 in United States Currency, $8,120.00 in United States Currency, $9,715.00 in United States Currency, 10908 Unity Lane, Commerce City, Colorado, 11425 Helena Street, Commerce City, Colorado, 14358 Glenayre Circle, Parker, Colorado, 15725 E. 97th Avenue, Commerce City, Colorado, 2014 Honda CRV VIN: 3CZRM3H33EG710843, 2015 Lexus RX 350 VIN: JTJZK1BA6F2422782, 2016 Lexus GX 460, VIN: JTJBM7FX9G5145879, 3428 Purcell Street, Brighton, Colorado, 370 Clubhouse Drive, Fort Lupton, Colorado, 385 Matsuno Street, Brighton, Colorado, 674 Wind Rower Court, Brighton, Colorado, Mens Rolex Oyster Perpetual Date Watch Attorney Elizabeth Jane Young added to party USA(pty:pla), filed by USA. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only), #2 Warrant for Arrest of Property, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Young, Elizabeth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USA v. $69,375.00 in United States Currency et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $22,036.00 in United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $5,294.00 in United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $3,100.00 in United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 15725 E. 97th Avenue, Commerce City, Colorado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $5,044.00 in United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $14,998.00 in United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 385 Matsuno Street, Brighton, Colorado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mens Rolex Oyster Perpetual Date Watch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $8,120.00 in United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 674 Wind Rower Court, Brighton, Colorado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 2016 Lexus GX 460, VIN: JTJBM7FX9G5145879
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $2,340.00 in United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $5,154.00 in United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $8,101.00 in United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $69,375.00 in United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $15,110.00 in United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $9,715.00 in United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 10908 Unity Lane, Commerce City, Colorado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 370 Clubhouse Drive, Fort Lupton, Colorado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 2014 Honda CRV VIN: 3CZRM3H33EG710843
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 2015 Lexus RX 350 VIN: JTJZK1BA6F2422782
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $3,332.00 in United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 14358 Glenayre Circle, Parker, Colorado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $4,000.00 in United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 11425 Helena Street, Commerce City, Colorado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3428 Purcell Street, Brighton, Colorado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: USA
Represented By: Elizabeth Jane Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?