Powel v. Liberty Mutual Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Pierre Powel
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv02346
Filed: August 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Nina Y Wang
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 09/27/19 Setting Scheduling/Planning Conference and Setting Deadline for Filing of Consent/Nonconsent Form. Consent Form due by 10/29/2019. Proposed Scheduling Order due by 11/5/2019. Scheduling/Planning Conference set for 11/12/2019 11:00 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. (nmarb, )
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 9/27/19 Setting Scheduling/Planning Conference and Setting Deadline for Filing of Consent/Nonconsent Form. Consent Form due by 10/29/2019. Proposed Scheduling Order due by 11/5/2019. Scheduling/Planning Conference set for 11/12/2019 11:00 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. (nmarb, )
September 16, 2019 Filing 9 CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #8 Order of Recusal. This case is randomly reassigned to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. All future pleadings should be designated as 19-cv-02346-NYW. (Text Only Entry) (jgonz, )
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER OF RECUSAL by Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 9/16/2019. (jgonz, )
September 16, 2019 Filing 7 Defendant's ANSWER to #1 Complaint, Attorney Brian John Spano added to party Liberty Mutual Insurance Company(pty:dft) by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company.(Spano, Brian)
August 20, 2019 Filing 6 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (angar, )
August 20, 2019 Filing 5 MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE, by Senior Judge Lewis T. Babcock. This case is randomly returned to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews for all further proceedings. All future pleadings should be designated as 19-cv-2346-SKC (angar, )
August 19, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (rvill, )
August 16, 2019 Filing 3 Case assigned to Judge Lewis T. Babcock and drawn to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. Text Only Entry. (rvill, )
August 16, 2019 Filing 2 ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES re: #1 Complaint filed by attorney Nicholas W. Mayle. Attorney has used an incorrect signature format in violation of D.C.COLO.LCivR 5.1(a) and 4.3(d) of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases). DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. In the future, the filer must affix the correct format for the signature block to all future documents.(Text Only Entry) (rvill, )
August 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against Liberty Mutual Insurance Company (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6846979)Attorney Nicholas W. Mayle added to party Pierre Powel(pty:pla), filed by Pierre Powel. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Mayle, Nicholas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Powel v. Liberty Mutual Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pierre Powel
Represented By: Nicholas W. Mayle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Brian John Spano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?