Blyth v. Monsanto Co. et al
Plaintiff: Blyth Clinton and Clinton Blyth
Defendant: Poudre Valley Cooperative Association, Inc., Monsanto Company, Monsanto Co. and Poudre Valley Co-Operative Association, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv02347
Filed: August 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Daniel D Domenico
Referring Judge: Kristen L Mix
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2019 Filing 25 Interdistrict Transmittal of Documents via e-mail to the Northern District of California, pursuant to the #24 Certified Copy of the Conditional Transfer Order. ecfhelpdesk@cand.uscourts.gov. Text Only Entry (evana, )
September 4, 2019 Filing 24 CERTIFIED COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-149) from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation pursuant to 28 USC 1407, transferring from The District of Colorado, 19-cv-02347 DDD-KLM, to the Northern District of California, to become part of MDL 2741, by Clerk on 9/4/2019. (evana, )
August 27, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE of Conditional Transfer Order by Plaintiff Clinton Blyth (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(Ramos, Andrew)
August 27, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance for Plaintiff Clinton Blyth by Andrew Scott Ramos on behalf of Clinton BlythAttorney Andrew Scott Ramos added to party Clinton Blyth(pty:pla) (Ramos, Andrew)
August 26, 2019 Filing 21 ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES: re: #18 Notice of Entry of Appearance filed by attorney Andrew Scott Ramos. Attorney has failed to comply with D.C.COLO.LCivR5.1(a) and 4.3(d) of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil Cases), which mandate the correct form for an attorneys signature block. This document does not have a s/ signature and must be re-filed. Also the document was scanned and not converted directly to portable document format (PDF). Future documents must be filed pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 5.1(a) and 1.3(f) of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil Cases). (Text Only Entry) (athom, )
August 26, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Jeffrey A. Massey on behalf of Poudre Valley Co-Operative Association, Inc.Attorney Jeffrey A. Massey added to party Poudre Valley Co-Operative Association, Inc.(pty:dft) (Massey, Jeffrey)
August 23, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant Poudre Valley Co-Operative Association, Inc.. (Masters, Margaret)
August 21, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Andrew Scott Ramos on behalf of Clinton Blyth (Ramos, Andrew)
August 21, 2019 Filing 17 ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES: re: #16 First MOTION to Remand to State Court Larimer County filed by attorney Roman Balaban. The s/signature did not match the filers name on the account for which the login and password are registered. DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. Action to take - future documents must be filed pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 5.1(a) and 4.3(c) of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases). The document was scanned and not converted directly to portable document format (PDF). DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. Action to take - future documents must be filed pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 5.1(a) and 1.3(f) of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil Cases). (Text Only Entry) (athom, ) Modified on 8/21/2019 to remove incorrect text in the advisory notice (athom, ).
August 20, 2019 Filing 16 First MOTION to Remand to State Court Larimer County by Plaintiff Clinton Blyth. (Attachments: #1 Brief in support)(Ramos, Andrew)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of Local Civ. R. 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, (4) conduct hearings, including evidentiary hearings, and submit proposed findings of fact and recommendations for rulings on dispositive motions, and (5) pursuant to Local Civ. R. 16.6 and at the discretion of the Magistrate Judge, convene such early neutral evaluation and/or settlement conferences and direct related procedures as may facilitate resolution of this case without the necessity of a motion or prior authorization of the undersigned. SO ORDERED by Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 8/20/2019. Text Only Entry (dddlc3, )
August 20, 2019 Filing 14 CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #12 Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge. All parties do not consent. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Daniel D. Domenico. All future pleadings should be designated as 19-cv-02347-DDD. (Text Only Entry) (nmarb, )
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 08/20/19. This matter is before the Court on the Consent/Non-Consent Form [#12], in which Defendant Monsanto Co. informs the Court that it does not consent to have a United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings. Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this case shall be assigned to a District Judge under D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1(c)(8) and D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1(a). (nmarb, )
August 19, 2019 Filing 12 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendant Monsanto Co. All parties do not consent.. (Hobbs, Eric)
August 19, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to #3 Complaint by Monsanto Co..(Hobbs, Eric)
August 16, 2019 Filing 10 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (cmadr, )
August 16, 2019 Filing 9 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. Text Only Entry. (cmadr, )
August 16, 2019 Filing 8 FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawls of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (cmadr, )
August 16, 2019 Filing 7 STATE COURT ORDER Granting Defendant Poudre Vally Co-Operative Association Inc.'s Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint, signed by a Larimer County District Judge on 2 August, 2019. (cmadr, )
August 16, 2019 Filing 6 STATE COURT ORDER Granting Monsanto's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading, signed by a Larimer County District Judge on 1 August, 2019. (cmadr, )
August 16, 2019 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons, Complaint upon Poudre Valley Co-Operative Association on 18 July, 2019. (cmadr, )
August 16, 2019 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons, Complaint upon Monstanto on 17 July, 2019 (cmadr, )
August 16, 2019 Filing 3 Civil COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against Monsanto Co., Poudre Valley Co-Operative Association, Inc., filed by Clinton Blyth.(cmadr, )
August 16, 2019 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Bayer AG for Monsanto Company. (Hobbs, Eric)
August 16, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Monsanto Company from District Court for the City and County of Larimer, Case Number 2019CV30621. (Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number 1082-6847152), filed by Monsanto Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Civil Complaint and Jury Demand, #2 Exhibit State Court Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit Affidavit of Service on Monsanto, #4 Exhibit Affidavit of Service on Poudre Valley CoOp, #5 Exhibit Order Granting Extension of Monsantos Responsive Pleading Deadline, #6 Exhibit Order Granting Extension of D-Poudre Valleys Responsive Pleading Deadline, #7 Exhibit Notice of Judicial Civil Case Management, #8 Exhibit Order Incorporating Courtroom Procedures, #9 Exhibit State Court Docket Sheet, #10 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hobbs, Eric)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Blyth v. Monsanto Co. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Poudre Valley Cooperative Association, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Represented By: Eric J. Hobbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monsanto Co.
Represented By: Eric J. Hobbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Poudre Valley Co-Operative Association, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Massey
Represented By: Margaret Neel Masters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Blyth Clinton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clinton Blyth
Represented By: Andrew Scott Ramos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?