Boulder Acquisitions, LLC v. First American Title Insurance Company
Plaintiff: BOULDER ACQUISITIONS, LLC
Defendant: First American Title Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv02348
Filed: August 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Robert E Blackburn
Referring Judge: Kristen L Mix
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 42:4053
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2019 Filing 13 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent First American Financial Corporation for First American Title Insurance Company. (Bailey, Steven)
October 8, 2019 Filing 12 Defendant's ANSWER to #1 Complaint, Defenses and Jury Demand by First American Title Insurance Company.(Bailey, Steven)
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 9/19/19 GRANTING #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond. First American Title Insurance Company answer due by 10/8/2019.(nmarb, )
September 17, 2019 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 9/17/19 regarding #9 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #1 Complaint, filed by First American Title Insurance Company. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. Text Only Entry (rebsec)
September 17, 2019 Filing 9 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #1 Complaint, by Defendant First American Title Insurance Company. (Bailey, Steven)
September 17, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Steven Paul Bailey on behalf of First American Title Insurance CompanyAttorney Steven Paul Bailey added to party First American Title Insurance Company(pty:dft) (Bailey, Steven)
September 17, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Alicia Marie Oaks on behalf of First American Title Insurance CompanyAttorney Alicia Marie Oaks added to party First American Title Insurance Company(pty:dft) (Oaks, Alicia)
September 9, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Boulder Acquisitions, LLC. First American Title Insurance Company served on 9/3/2019, answer due 9/24/2019. (Ferguson, Janette)
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 08/23/19 Setting Scheduling/Planning Conference. Proposed Scheduling Order due by 10/29/2019. Scheduling/Planning Conference set for 11/5/2019 10:00 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1, #2 Attachment 2, #3 Attachment 3) (nmarb, )
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. IT IS ORDERED that pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this matter is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge:(1) To convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b), enter a Scheduling Order that satisfies the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, and enter such orders as appropriate to enforce the Scheduling order and resolve discovery matters; provided, further that the scheduling conference, the Magistrate Judge shall advise the parties of Judge Blackburns practice standards found at www.cod.uscourts.gov.;(2) To hear and finally determine non-dispositive matters that have been referred, subject to the exceptions found in 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A); and(3) To hear and make recommendations on dispositive matters that have been referred as defined in 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLOLCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, this court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding.By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 8/19/19. Text Only Entry (rebsec)
August 19, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (rsams, )
August 16, 2019 Filing 2 Case assigned to Judge Robert E. Blackburn and drawn to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. Text Only Entry. (rsams, )
August 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and JURY DEMAND against First American Title Insurance Company (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6847497)Attorney Janette Lee Ferguson added to party BOULDER ACQUISITIONS, LLC(pty:pla), filed by BOULDER ACQUISITIONS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Summons)(Ferguson, Janette)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Boulder Acquisitions, LLC v. First American Title Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First American Title Insurance Company
Represented By: Alicia Marie Oaks
Represented By: Steven Paul Bailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BOULDER ACQUISITIONS, LLC
Represented By: Janette Lee Ferguson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?