KKW Trucking, Inc. v. Castellano 03 Trucking, L.L.C. et al
Plaintiff: KKW Trucking, Inc.
Defendant: Rogel Lazaro Aguilera-Mederos and Castellano 03 Trucking, L.L.C.
Case Number: 1:2019cv02351
Filed: August 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Robert E Blackburn
Referring Judge: Nina Y Wang
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2019 Filing 16 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Rogel Lazaro Aguilera-Mederos, Castellano 03 Trucking, L.L.C., filed by KKW Trucking, Inc., filed pursuant to 15 Order. (nmarb, )
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 11/19/2019. This matter comes before this court on the #14 Response to the Order to Show Cause filed by KKW Trucking, Inc. Upon review of the Response and corresponding exhibits, this court has ascertained that subject matter jurisdiction is satisfied. Accordingly, the #13 Order to Show Cause is DISCHARGED and the Clerk of the Court shall ACCEPT Plaintiff's proposed Amended Complaint [#14-2] and shall file it as a separate entry on the court's docket. Text Only Entry (nywlc2, )
November 15, 2019 Filing 14 RESPONSE to the Court's November 4, 2019 Order to Show Cause and Request for Leave to Amend Its Complaint Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 15(a)(2) by Plaintiff KKW Trucking, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Beam, Thomas)
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 11/4/2019 as to why this court should not recommend dismissal of this action for want of federal subject matter jurisdiction. #11 Motion for Discovery to Conduct Expedited Discovery is DENIED. Show Cause Response due by 11/18/2019.(tsher, ) Modified on 11/19/2019 to show as DISCHARGED pursuant to 15 Order. (nmarb, ).
October 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER REFERRING MOTION(S): #11 MOTION for Discovery Expedited filed by KKW Trucking, Inc. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 10/25/2019. Text Only Entry (reblc2)
October 25, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Discovery Expedited by Plaintiff KKW Trucking, Inc.. (Beam, Thomas)
October 17, 2019 Filing 10 COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ORDER for Scheduling Conference/Status Conference held on 10/17/2019 before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Plaintiff shall file a motion for discovery absent the entry of Defendants. Plaintiff anticipates the motion can be filed in seven (7) days. FTR: Courtroom A-502. (bwilk, )
October 10, 2019 Filing 9 Proposed Scheduling Order by Plaintiff KKW Trucking, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Beam, Thomas)
September 24, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Brian John Urankar on behalf of KKW Trucking, Inc.Attorney Brian John Urankar added to party KKW Trucking, Inc.(pty:pla) (Urankar, Brian)
September 24, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by KKW Trucking, Inc.. Castellano 03 Trucking, L.L.C. served on 9/6/2019, answer due 9/27/2019. (Beam, Thomas)
September 24, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by KKW Trucking, Inc.. Rogel Lazaro Aguilera-Mederos served on 9/3/2019, answer due 9/24/2019. (Beam, Thomas)
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 9/4/19 Setting Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference. Proposed Scheduling Order due on or before 10/10/2019. Scheduling Conference set for 10/17/2019 10:00 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. (nmarb, )
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. IT IS ORDERED that pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this matter is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge:(1) To convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b), enter a Scheduling Order that satisfies the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, and enter such orders as appropriate to enforce the Scheduling order and resolve discovery matters; provided, further that the scheduling conference, the Magistrate Judge shall advise the parties of Judge Blackburns practice standards found at www.cod.uscourts.gov.;(2) To hear and finally determine non-dispositive matters that have been referred, subject to the exceptions found in 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A); and(3) To hear and make recommendations on dispositive matters that have been referred as defined in 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLOLCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, this court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 8/19/19. Text Only Entry (rebsec)
August 19, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (rsams, )
August 16, 2019 Filing 2 Case assigned to Judge Robert E. Blackburn and drawn to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Text Only Entry. (rsams, )
August 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against Rogel Lazaro Aguilera-Mederos, Castellano 03 Trucking, L.L.C. (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6847774)Attorney Thomas Lee Beam added to party KKW Trucking, Inc.(pty:pla), filed by KKW Trucking, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Summons Castellano 03 Trucking, L.L.C., #2 Summons Rogel Lazaro Aguilera-Mederos, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Beam, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: KKW Trucking, Inc. v. Castellano 03 Trucking, L.L.C. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rogel Lazaro Aguilera-Mederos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Castellano 03 Trucking, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KKW Trucking, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas Lee Beam
Represented By: Brian John Urankar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?