Jump Rope Systems, LLC v. Fit For Life LLC
Plaintiff: Jump Rope Systems, LLC
Defendant: Fit For Life LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv02355
Filed: August 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Philip A Brimmer
Referring Judge: N Reid Neureiter
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28:1338
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 22, 2019 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Jump Rope Systems, LLC. Fit For Life LLC waiver sent on 8/21/2019, answer due 10/21/2019. (Limpus, Christopher)
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 8/21/2019. Scheduling Conference set for 10/29/2019 11:00 AM in Courtroom C205 before Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. (tsher, )
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter for non-dispositive matters. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, and (4) conduct a pretrial conference and enter a pretrial order. Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, this court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. By Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 8/21/19. Text Only Entry (pabsec)
August 19, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (agarc, )
August 19, 2019 Filing 5 Report re Patent/Trademark: Report on the filing of an action emailed (NEF) to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (agarc, )
August 16, 2019 Filing 4 Case assigned to Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer and drawn to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. Text Only Entry. (agarc, )
August 16, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Fit For Life LLC by Plaintiff Jump Rope Systems, LLC. (Limpus, Christopher)
August 16, 2019 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Limpus, Christopher)
August 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Fit For Life LLC (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6848220)Attorney Christopher Lee Limpus added to party Jump Rope Systems, LLC(pty:pla), filed by Jump Rope Systems, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Limpus, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jump Rope Systems, LLC v. Fit For Life LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fit For Life LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jump Rope Systems, LLC
Represented By: Christopher Lee Limpus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?