Cartwright v. No Named Defendant
Plaintiff: Shondel Cartwright
Defendant: No Named Defendant
Case Number: 1:2019cv02363
Filed: August 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Gordon P Gallagher
Nature of Suit: Prisoner - Civil Rights (U.S. not a defendant)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER In response to the Court's August 20, 2019 Order Directing Plaintiff to Cure Deficiencies, Plaintiff has filed a letter in this action (ECF No. #4 ). To the extent Plaintiff requests guidance as to which court- approved form to utilize, the Court does not provide legal advice. If Plaintiff would like to pursue any claims in this Court, she must comply with the Court's August 20, 2019 Order Directing Plaintiff to Cure Deficiencies. And Plaintiff is cautioned that pursuant to Rule 5.1(c) of the Local Rules of Practice of the United States District Court for the District of Colorado Civil, "[i]f not filed electronically, an unrepresented prisoner or party shall use the procedures, forms, and instructions posted on the court's website." To the extent Plaintiff requests an extension of time (ECF No. #4 at 2) to comply with the Court's August 20, 2019 order to cure, the request is granted as provided herein. Plaintiff shall cure the deficiencies on or before October 20, 2019. If Plaintiff fails to comply with the order to cure within the time allowed, this action will be dismissed without further notice, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 9/17/2019.(evana, )
September 6, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Extension of Time, by Plaintiff Shondel Cartwright. (evana, )
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO CURE DEFICIENCIES within thirty (30) days from the date of this order. Any papers that Plaintiff files in response to this order must include the civil action number on this order. That, if Plaintiff fails to cure all of the designated deficiencies within thirty (30) days from the date of this order, the action will be dismissed without further notice. The dismissal shall be without prejudice, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 8/20/2019. (evana, )
August 19, 2019 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher. Text Only Entry. (rvill, )
August 19, 2019 Filing 1 LETTER by Plaintiff Shondel Cartwright. (rvill, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cartwright v. No Named Defendant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: No Named Defendant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shondel Cartwright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?