In re: Shannon Elliott
Interested Party: United States Bankruptcy Court for the District of Colorado and U.S. Trustee
Appellant: John A. Cimino
In Re: Shannon A. Elliott
Appellee: Shannon Angelica Sommer Elliott
Case Number: 1:2019cv02366
Filed: August 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Marcia S Krieger
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER denying #11 Motion for Extension of Time to File Opening Brief for failure to comply with Local Rule 7.1. However, counsel is granted to leave to refile this motion once the Rule 7.1 certification has been satisfied. As to the transcript issue, the Court notes the following language set forth on the bankruptcy court's docket sheet (#5-1), "[p]ursuant to the policy adopted by the Judicial Conference, transcripts are available for inspection only at the clerk's office or may be purchased from the court transcriber for a 90 day period." (#169). Here, the transcript will be made available to the general public on November 14, 2019. "Until that time the transcript may be viewed at the Bankruptcy Court or a copy may be obtained from the official court transcriber." (#170). By Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 10/1/2019. Text Only Entry(msklc4, )
September 30, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time to file opening brief or to unrestrict transcripts by Appellant John A. Cimino. (Cimino, John)
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Establishing Bankruptcy Appeal Briefing Requirements, by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 9/4/2019. (sphil, )
August 29, 2019 Filing 9 BANKRUPTCY RECORD ON APPEAL. Number of Volumes: Volumes 1A to 1C. (Attachments: #1 Volume Ia - Pleadings 1 to 60, #2 Volume Ib - Pleadings 61 to 126, #3 Volume Ic - Pleadings 127 to 178). (sphil, )
August 29, 2019 Filing 8 BANKRUPTCY RECORD ON APPEAL. Number of Volumes: 2 volumes. Sealed/Restricted Volume Numbers:2. Appellant Brief due by 9/28/2019. Appellee Brief due by 10/28/2019. Appellant Reply Brief due by 11/11/2019. (Attachments: #1 volume 2 restricted transcripts)(sphil, )
August 20, 2019 Filing 7 ADVISORY NOTICE TO ATTORNEY AND COURT: Under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3(a), Sean M. Cloyes was administratively removed from the court's attorney roll and barred from filing electronically under CM/ECF for failing to pay the 2018 Biennial Fee by January 31, 2019. Counsel must complete a Bar/ECF application through counsel's Attorney Services Portal account and pay the full application fee to be restored to the attorney roll and CM/ECF. (Text Only Entry) (mfred)
August 20, 2019 Filing 4 ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES:Sean M. Cloyes. DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. Action to take - counsel must submit a change of contact request through the Attorney Services Portal Account pursuant to D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(c) and 3.5 of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases).(Text Only Entry) (cmadr, )
August 19, 2019 Filing 6 CASE OPENING. The above captioned case was opened on 8/19/2019 and assigned the case number referenced above. After docketing of the record on appeal from the U.S. Bankruptcy Court, briefing will proceed in accordance with Bankruptcy Rules 8014, 8015, and 8018, and any orders of the court. When referencing trial exhibits you must attach copies to your brief. If the court finds it necessary to have the originals presented it will issue an order. All filings with the United States District Court, unless otherwise permitted by our Electronic Case Filing Procedures, must be done electronically. Text Only Entry. (cmadr, )
August 19, 2019 Filing 5 Notice of Transmittal of Appeal Pursuant to Rule 8003 (d)re: #1 Bankruptcy Appeal (Attachments: #1 Docket Sheet)(cmadr, )
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER signed by Chief Judge Michael E. Romero on 17 July, 2019. (cmadr, )
August 19, 2019 Filing 2 Case assigned to Judge Marcia S. Krieger. Text Only Entry. (cmadr, )
August 19, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT by Appellant John A. Cimino in re: Docket Number #162-Order of 17 July, 2019. (cmadr, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In re: Shannon Elliott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: United States Bankruptcy Court for the District of Colorado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: U.S. Trustee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: John A. Cimino
Represented By: John Arthur Cimino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: Shannon A. Elliott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Shannon Angelica Sommer Elliott
Represented By: Sean M. Cloyes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?