USA v. 2014 Ford Raptor, VIN: 1FTFW1R67EFA14620 et al
Plaintiff: USA
Defendant: 2011 Porsche 977/911 Convertible, VIN: WP0CD2A97BS773436 and 2014 Ford Raptor, VIN: 1FTFW1R67EFA14620
Claimant: Canvas Credit Union and David Anthony Guzman
Case Number: 1:2019cv02368
Filed: August 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Robert E Blackburn
Referring Judge: Scott T Varholak
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:881
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2019 Filing 16 ANSWER to #8 Amended Complaint for Forfeiture by David Anthony Guzman.(Saint-Veltri, Joseph)
September 26, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Amended Complaint for Forfeiture by Plaintiff USA (Andrews, Tonya)
September 25, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Joel Aaron Richardson on behalf of Canvas Credit UnionAttorney Joel Aaron Richardson added to party Canvas Credit Union(pty:clm) (Richardson, Joel)
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MINUTE ORDER This matter is set for a Status Conference on 11/5/2019 09:30 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. SO ORDERED, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 9/25/2019. Text Only Entry (stvlc1, )
September 25, 2019 Filing 12 CLAIM by Claimant Canvas Credit Union. (Frazier, Michael)
September 17, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE re #8 Amended Complaint : Notice of Verified Claim by Claimant David Anthony Guzman (Saint-Veltri, Joseph)
September 16, 2019 Filing 10 WARRANT for Arrest of Property In Rem issued 9/16/2019 (jgonz, )
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER FOR WARRANT for Arrest of Property In Rem by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 9/16/2019. (jgonz, )
September 10, 2019 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT for Forfeiture In Rem against 2011 Porsche 977/911 Convertible, VIN: WP0CD2A97BS773436, 2014 Ford Raptor, VIN: 1FTFW1R67EFA14620, David Anthony Guzman, filed by USA.(Andrews, Tonya)
September 10, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Filing Amended Pleading re #1 Complaint, by Plaintiff USA (Attachments: #1 Redline Version Complaint)(Andrews, Tonya)
September 5, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Verified Claim by Defendant David Anthony Guzman (Saint-Veltri, Joseph)
August 23, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Complaint for Forfeiture by Plaintiff USA (Andrews, Tonya)
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. IT IS ORDERED that pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this matter is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge:(1) To convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b), enter a Scheduling Order that satisfies the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, and enter such orders as appropriate to enforce the Scheduling order and resolve discovery matters; provided, further that the scheduling conference, the Magistrate Judge shall advise the parties of Judge Blackburns practice standards found at www.cod.uscourts.gov.;(2) To hear and finally determine non-dispositive matters that have been referred, subject to the exceptions found in 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A); and(3) To hear and make recommendations on dispositive matters that have been referred as defined in 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLOLCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, this court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 8/22/19. Text Only Entry (rebsec)
August 21, 2019 Filing 3 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (rvill, )
August 20, 2019 Filing 2 Case assigned to Judge Robert E. Blackburn and drawn to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Text Only Entry. (rvill, )
August 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR FORFEITURE IN REM against 2011 Porsche 977/911 Convertible, VIN: WP0CD2A97BS773436, 2014 Ford Raptor, VIN: 1FTFW1R67EFA14620 Attorney Tonya Shotwell Andrews added to party USA(pty:pla), filed by USA. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only), #2 Warrant for Arrest of Property, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Andrews, Tonya)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USA v. 2014 Ford Raptor, VIN: 1FTFW1R67EFA14620 et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: USA
Represented By: Tonya Shotwell Andrews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 2011 Porsche 977/911 Convertible, VIN: WP0CD2A97BS773436
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 2014 Ford Raptor, VIN: 1FTFW1R67EFA14620
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Canvas Credit Union
Represented By: Joel Aaron Richardson
Represented By: Michael O. Frazier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: David Anthony Guzman
Represented By: Joseph Saint-Veltri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?