Handy v. City & County of Denver et al
Plaintiff: Wyatt T. Handy, Jr.
Defendant: City & County of Denver, Unknown Employee, Greta Aldridge and Denver Pretrial Services Dept.
Case Number: 1:2019cv02403
Filed: August 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Gordon P Gallagher
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. That Plaintiff show cause in writing within thirty days from the date of this Order why this action should not be dismissed as repetitive of See Handy v. City & County of Denver, et al., No. 19-cv-00735- LTB (D. Colo. May 21, 2019. That if Plaintiff fails to show cause to the Court's satisfaction within thirty days from the date of this Order, the action will be subject to dismissal as repetitious, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 9/25/2019. (evana, )
August 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER that the Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs (Long Form), ECF No. #2 , is GRANTED, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 8/25/2019.(evana, )
August 23, 2019 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher. Text Only Entry. (cmadr, )
August 23, 2019 Filing 2 Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs. by Plaintiff Wyatt T. Handy, Jr. (cmadr, )
August 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Greta Aldridge, City & County of Denver, Denver Pretrial Services Dept., Unknown Employee, filed by Wyatt T. Handy, Jr.(cmadr, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Handy v. City & County of Denver et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City & County of Denver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Employee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greta Aldridge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Denver Pretrial Services Dept.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wyatt T. Handy, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?