McClure v. Azar
Plaintiff: Margaret McClure
Defendant: Alex M. Azar, II and Alex M. Azar
Case Number: 1:2019cv02406
Filed: August 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Nina Y Wang
Nature of Suit: Mandamus & Other
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 4, 2019 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Margaret McClure. Alex M. Azar served on 9/4/2019, answer due 9/25/2019. (Attachments: #1 Receipt, #2 Receipt)(Landis, Brett)
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 9/11/19 Setting Scheduling/Planning Conference and Setting Deadline for Filing of Consent/Nonconsent Form. Consent Form due on or before 11/6/2019. Proposed Scheduling Order due on or before 11/13/2019. Scheduling/Planning Conference set for 11/20/2019 09:30 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. (nmarb, )
September 3, 2019 Filing 11 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (athom, )
September 3, 2019 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE by Senior Judge Blackburn. This case is randomly reassigned to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. All future pleadings should be designated as 19-cv-02406-NYW. (athom, )
September 3, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (cmadr, )
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Granting #4 Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis and Drawing Case, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 8/30/2019. This case is randomly reassigned to Senior Judge Robert E. Blackburn. All future pleadings should be designated as 19-cv-2406-REB (angar, )
August 28, 2019 Filing 7 CASE REASSIGNED. This case was drawn using the incorrect assignment criteria. Pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 8.1(a) this case has been directly reassigned to Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher. All future pleadings should be designated as 19-cv-2406-GPG. (Text Only Entry) (cmadr, )
August 26, 2019 Filing 6 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (rvill, )
August 26, 2019 Filing 5 Case assigned to Judge Robert E. Blackburn. Text Only Entry. (rvill, )
August 26, 2019 Filing 4 Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs. by Plaintiff Margaret McClure. (Landis, Brett)
August 26, 2019 Filing 3 Administrative Notice: No filing fee received with case opening. Attorney contacted with instructions to submit filing fee within 3 hours. (Text Only Entry) (cmadr, )
August 23, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Alex M. Azar re #1 Complaint by Plaintiff Margaret McClure. (Landis, Brett)
August 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Injunctive and Mandamus Relief against Alex M. Azar, II Attorney Brett Elizabeth Landis added to party Margaret McClure(pty:pla), filed by Margaret McClure.(Landis, Brett)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McClure v. Azar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Margaret McClure
Represented By: Brett Elizabeth Landis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alex M. Azar, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alex M. Azar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?