Moores v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Company
Plaintiff: Michael Moores
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv02410
Filed: August 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Kristen L Mix
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 18, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Rachel Alain Wright on behalf of State Farm Mutual Automobile CompanyAttorney Rachel Alain Wright added to party State Farm Mutual Automobile Company(pty:dft) (Wright, Rachel)
October 18, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Michael O. Frazier on behalf of State Farm Mutual Automobile CompanyAttorney Michael O. Frazier added to party State Farm Mutual Automobile Company(pty:dft) (Frazier, Michael)
August 29, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to #6 Amended Complaint by State Farm Mutual Automobile Company.(Wagner, Rebecca)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 08/26/19 Setting Scheduling/Planning Conference. Proposed Scheduling Order due on or before 10/30/2019. Scheduling/Planning Conference set for 11/6/2019 10:00 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1, #2 Attachment 2) (nmarb, )
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER. Pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1(c)(4), the deadline to file the Consent/Non-Consent to United States Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form [#8] is October 22, 2019. by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 8/26/2019. Text Only Entry (klmlc2, )
August 23, 2019 Filing 8 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (rsams, )
August 23, 2019 Filing 7 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. Text Only Entry. (rsams, )
August 23, 2019 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT against State Farm Mutual Automobile Company, filed by Michael Moores.(rsams, )
August 23, 2019 Filing 5 COMPLAINT against State Farm Mutual Automobile Company, filed by Michael Moores.(rsams, )
August 23, 2019 Filing 4 FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawls of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (rsams, )
August 23, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Michael Henry Jackson Born on behalf of Michael Moores Attorney Michael Henry Jackson Born added to party Michael Moores (pty:pla) (Born, Michael)
August 23, 2019 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Wagner, Rebecca)
August 23, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by State Farm Mutual Automobile Company from Denver County District Court, Case Number 2019CV032986. (Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number 1082-6860742), filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Docket Sheet, #4 Exhibit A, #5 Exhibit A, #6 Exhibit A, #7 Exhibit A, #8 Exhibit A, #9 Exhibit A, #10 Exhibit B)(Wagner, Rebecca)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moores v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Company
Represented By: Rebecca Kirsten Wagner
Represented By: Rachel Alain Wright
Represented By: Michael O. Frazier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Moores
Represented By: Michael Henry Jackson Born
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?