Craig v. Gallery M Inc.
Plaintiff: Glen Craig
Defendant: Gallery M Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv02413
Filed: August 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: N Reid Neureiter
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 18, 2019 Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Robinson, Christopher)
October 18, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to ComplaintAttorney Christopher John Robinson added to party Gallery M Inc.(pty:dft) by Gallery M Inc..(Robinson, Christopher)
October 11, 2019 Filing 7 ADVISORY NOTICE TO ATTORNEY AND COURT: Under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3(a), RICHARD LIEBOWITZ was administratively removed from the court's attorney roll and barred from filing electronically under CM/ECF for failing to pay the 2018 Biennial Fee. Counsel must complete a Bar/ECF application through counsel's Attorney Services Portal account and pay the full application fee to be restored to the attorney roll and CM/ECF. Upon reinstatement, counsel must file a Notice of Entry of Appearance in this case. (Text Only Entry) (mfred)
September 17, 2019 Filing 6 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Answer or Respond to the Complaint by Defendant Gallery M Inc.. Gallery M Inc. answer due 10/18/2019. (Liebowitz, Richard)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 8/26/2019. Consent Form due by 10/29/2019. Scheduling Conference set for 11/12/2019 09:30 AM in Courtroom C205 before Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. (tsher, )
August 26, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (cmadr, )
August 25, 2019 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. Text Only Entry. (cmadr, )
August 25, 2019 Filing 2 Report re Copyright: Report on the filing of an action emailed separately to the Director of the Copyright Office. (cmadr, )
August 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Gallery M Inc. (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6861473)Attorney Richard Liebowitz added to party Glen Craig(pty:pla), filed by Glen Craig. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Summons, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Liebowitz, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Craig v. Gallery M Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gallery M Inc.
Represented By: Christopher John Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Glen Craig
Represented By: Richard Liebowitz
Represented By: Richard P. Liebowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?