United States Securities and Exchange Commission v. Hartman Wright Group, LLC et al
Plaintiff: United States Securities and Exchange Commission
Defendant: Hartman Wright Group, LLC and Tytus W. Harkins
Case Number: 1:2019cv02418
Filed: August 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Kathleen M Tafoya
Nature of Suit: Securities, Commodities, Exchange
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 77
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 23, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 AMENDED ORDER Scheduling Conference for 11/25/2019 10:00 AM in Courtroom 101 (Colorado Springs) before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Consent Form due by 11/18/2019. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 09/19/2019. (ksena)
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint. Tytus W. Harkins answer due 11/15/2019; Hartman Wright Group, LLC answer due 11/15/2019. Defendant Hartman Wright Group, LLC is advised that, pursuant to D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(b), it may not appear without counsel admitted to the bar of this Court. Pleadings filed on behalf of Harman Wright Group, LLC, without counsel will be stricken. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 9/19/19. Text Only Entry(kmtlc1 )
September 18, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond by Defendant Tytus W. Harkins. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(jgonz, )
September 4, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States Securities and Exchange Commission. Hartman Wright Group, LLC served on 8/30/2019, answer due 9/20/2019. (McKenna, Stephen)
September 4, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States Securities and Exchange Commission. Tytus W. Harkins served on 8/30/2019, answer due 9/20/2019. (McKenna, Stephen)
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 10/28/2019 10:00 AM in Courtroom 101 (Colorado Springs) before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Consent Form due by 10/21/2019. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 09/03/2019. (ksena)
August 27, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Terry R. Miller on behalf of United States Securities and Exchange CommissionAttorney Terry R. Miller added to party United States Securities and Exchange Commission(pty:pla) (Miller, Terry)
August 27, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (agarc, )
August 26, 2019 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Text Only Entry. (agarc, )
August 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Tytus W. Harkins, Hartman Wright Group, LLC Attorney Stephen C. McKenna added to party United States Securities and Exchange Commission(pty:pla), filed by United States Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Hartman Wright Group, LLC, #3 Summons Tytus Hartman)(McKenna, Stephen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States Securities and Exchange Commission v. Hartman Wright Group, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States Securities and Exchange Commission
Represented By: Stephen C. McKenna
Represented By: Terry R. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hartman Wright Group, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tytus W. Harkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?