Epic Mountain Sports LLC v. Vail Corporation, The et al
Plaintiff: Epic Mountain Sports LLC
Defendant: Vail Corporation, SSI Venture LLC and Vail Corporation, The
Case Number: 1:2019cv02470
Filed: August 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Kristen L Mix
Referring Judge: Raymond P Moore
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 10/24/19. (nmarb, )
October 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 10/24/19 GRANTING #24 Stipulated Motion for Protective Order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Protective Order [#24] supplied by the parties is accepted for filing and entered as an Order of the Court, with interlineations, as of the date of this Minute Order. (nmarb, )
October 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 SCHEDULING ORDER: by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 10/23/19. (lgale, )
October 23, 2019 Filing 26 MINUTE ENTRY for Scheduling Conference held before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 10/23/2019. Discovery due by 4/24/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 9/7/2020. Status Report due by 8/31/2020. Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/15/2021 1:30 PM in Courtroom A401 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. FTR: KLM Courtroom A401. (Attachments: #1 Discovery Procedures and Requirements of Practice) (lgale, )
October 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MEMORANDUM regarding #24 Stipulated MOTION for Protective Order filed by SSI Venture LLC, Vail Corporation, The. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. Entered by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 10/23/2019. (Text Only Entry) (rmsec )
October 22, 2019 Filing 24 Stipulated MOTION for Protective Order by Defendants SSI Venture LLC, Vail Corporation, The. (Hofmann, Michael)
October 18, 2019 Filing 23 REPLY to Response to #13 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Plaintiff's Colorado Consumer Protection Act Claim) filed by Defendants SSI Venture LLC, Vail Corporation, The. (Hofmann, Michael)
October 16, 2019 Filing 22 Proposed Scheduling Order by Defendants SSI Venture LLC, Vail Corporation, The. (Hofmann, Michael)
October 10, 2019 Filing 21 ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES re: #20 Response to Motion, filed by attorney Weston Michael Cole. The s/signature did not match the filers name on the account for which the login and password are registered. DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. Action to take - future documents must be filed pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 5.1(a) and 4.3(c) of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases).(Text Only Entry) (rvill, )
October 4, 2019 Filing 20 RESPONSE to #13 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Plaintiff's Colorado Consumer Protection Act Claim) Plaintiff's Response to Defendants' F.R.C.P. 12(b)(6) Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Colorado Consumer Protection Act Claim filed by Plaintiff Epic Mountain Sports LLC. (Cole, Weston)
October 2, 2019 Filing 19 MEMORANDUM regarding #13 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Plaintiff's Colorado Consumer Protection Act Claim) filed by SSI Venture LLC, Vail Corporation, The. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. Entered by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 10/2/2019. (Text Only Entry) (rmsec )
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MINUTE ORDER: With the assignment of this matter, the parties are advised that throughout this case they are expected to be familiar and comply with not only the Local Rules of this District, but also Judge Raymond P. Moore's Civil Practice Standards, which may be found at: http://www.cod.uscourts.gov/JudicialOfficers/ActiveArticleIIIJudges/HonRaymondPMoore.aspx. SO ORDERED by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 10/2/2019. (Text Only Entry) (rmsec )
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, (4) conduct a pretrial conference and enter a pretrial order, and (5) conduct hearings, including evidentiary hearings, and submit proposed findings of fact and recommendations for rulings on dispositive motions. Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, this court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. Entered by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 10/2/2019. (Text Only Entry) (rmsec )
October 1, 2019 Filing 16 CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #14 Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge. All parties do not consent. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Raymond P. Moore. All future pleadings should be designated as 19-cv-02470-RM. (Text Only Entry) (nmarb, )
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 10/1/19 re: #14 Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge filed by SSI Venture LLC, Vail Corporation, The. At least one party in this civil action does not consent to have a United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings. Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this case shall be assigned to a District Judge under D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1(c)(8) and D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1(a). (nmarb, )
September 27, 2019 Filing 14 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendants SSI Venture LLC, Vail Corporation, The All parties do not consent.. (Hofmann, Michael)
September 16, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Plaintiff's Colorado Consumer Protection Act Claim) by Defendants SSI Venture LLC, Vail Corporation, The. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Hofmann, Michael)
September 16, 2019 Filing 12 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Vail Holdings, Inc. for Vail Corporation, The; Corporate Parent SSV Holdings, Inc. for SSI Venture LLC. (Hofmann, Michael)
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 9/10/19 Setting Scheduling/Planning Conference. Proposed Scheduling Order due on or before 10/16/2019. Scheduling/Planning Conference set for 10/23/2019 10:30 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1, #2 Attachment 2) (nmarb, )
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER. Pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1(c)(4), the deadline to file the Consent/Non-Consent to United States Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form [#6] is October 9, 2019. by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 9/10/2019. Text Only Entry (klmlc2, )
September 3, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Weston Michael Cole on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Weston Michael Cole added to party Epic Mountain Sports LLC(pty:pla) (Cole, Weston)
August 30, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Clifford Benjamin Stricklin on behalf of SSI Venture LLC, Vail Corporation, TheAttorney Clifford Benjamin Stricklin added to party SSI Venture LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Clifford Benjamin Stricklin added to party Vail Corporation, The(pty:dft) (Stricklin, Clifford)
August 30, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Stephen D. Rynerson on behalf of SSI Venture LLC, Vail Corporation, TheAttorney Stephen D. Rynerson added to party SSI Venture LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Stephen D. Rynerson added to party Vail Corporation, The(pty:dft) (Rynerson, Stephen)
August 30, 2019 Filing 6 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (agarc, )
August 30, 2019 Filing 5 Report re Patent/Trademark: Report on the filing of an action emailed (NEF) to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (agarc, )
August 29, 2019 Filing 4 COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against SSI Venture LLC, and Vail Corporation, The, filed by Epic Mountain Sports LLC.(agarc, )
August 29, 2019 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. Text Only Entry. (agarc, )
August 29, 2019 Filing 2 FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawls of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. Text only entry. (agarc, )
August 29, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Vail Corporation, SSI Venture LLC from District Court Grand County Colorado, Case Number 2019cv30070. (Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number 1082-6870594), filed by Vail Corporation, SSI Venture LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exh A, #2 Exhibit Exh B, #3 Exhibit Exh C, #4 Exhibit Exh D, #5 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hofmann, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Epic Mountain Sports LLC v. Vail Corporation, The et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Epic Mountain Sports LLC
Represented By: Weston Michael Cole
Represented By: Douglas B. Norberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vail Corporation
Represented By: Michael James Hofmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SSI Venture LLC
Represented By: Michael James Hofmann
Represented By: Clifford Benjamin Stricklin
Represented By: Stephen D. Rynerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vail Corporation, The
Represented By: Michael James Hofmann
Represented By: Clifford Benjamin Stricklin
Represented By: Stephen D. Rynerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?