Hart et al v. Blume
Plaintiff: Michael F Hart, Kathy Hart and Michael Hart
Defendant: Omer Blume
Case Number: 1:2019cv02471
Filed: August 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Robert E Blackburn
Referring Judge: Scott T Varholak
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER. In light of 8 Order on Motion for Leave, and because Defendant has yet to appear in this matter, the Scheduling Conference set for 11/4/2019 10:00 AM is VACATED and RESET for 1/14/2020 09:30 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. The parties shall file a Joint Proposed Scheduling Order on or before 1/7/2020. SO ORDERED, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 10/22/2019. Text Only Entry (stvlc2, )
October 18, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE of Service by Clerk of Court re #1 Complaint, 8 Order on Motion for Leave to Serve for Service of Process. (Attachments: #1 USMS Form) (cmadr, )
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Leave to Serve Defendant by United States Marshal. Defendant appears to be evading service of process. Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(c)(3), the court may order that service be made by a United States marshal or deputy marshal at the plaintiff's request. Other federal district courts have held service under Rule 4(c)(3) to be appropriate when a defendant is evading service. See, e.g., Hugler v. Guard Servs. Int. Inc., No. 1:16-MI-0036-CAP-JSA, 2017 WL 11048839, at *2 (N.D. Ga. Mar. 22, 2017) (directing service by the United States Marshals Service based on defendants consistent attempts to evade service under Rule 4(c)(3)); Coleman v. District of Columbia, 284 F.R.D. 16, 2122 (D.D.C. 2012) (noting that if plaintiff was concerned that defendant was intentionally evading service, plaintiff could have moved to have the U.S. Marshal serve that defendant, pursuant to Rule 4(c)(3)). Accordingly, the Motion is GRANTED and the United States Marshal Service is directed to effectuate service on Defendant Omer Blume at the following address: 22 Park Ave., Newton, MA 02459. SO ORDERED, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 10/15/2019. Text Only Entry(stvlc2, )
October 15, 2019 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 10/15/19 regarding #6 MOTION for Leave to Serve the Defendant by United States Marshal #1 Complaint, filed by Kathy Hart, Michael Hart. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Text Only Entry (rebsec)
October 14, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Serve the Defendant by United States Marshal #1 Complaint, by Plaintiffs Kathy Hart, Michael Hart. (Chalat, James)
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 11/4/2019 10:00 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Proposed Scheduling Order due 10/28/2019, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 9/3/2019. (jgonz, )
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. IT IS ORDERED that pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this matter is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge:(1) To convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b), enter a Scheduling Order that satisfies the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, and enter such orders as appropriate to enforce the Scheduling order and resolve discovery matters; provided, further that the scheduling conference, the Magistrate Judge shall advise the parties of Judge Blackburns practice standards found at www.cod.uscourts.gov.;(2) To hear and finally determine non-dispositive matters that have been referred, subject to the exceptions found in 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A); and(3) To hear and make recommendations on dispositive matters that have been referred as defined in 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLOLCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, this court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding.By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 9/3/19. Text Only Entry (rebsec)
August 30, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (agarc, )
August 30, 2019 Filing 2 Case assigned to Judge Robert E. Blackburn and drawn to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Text Only Entry. (agarc, )
August 29, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Michael F Hart, Kathy Hart (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6870459)Attorney James H. Chalat added to party Kathy Hart(pty:pla), Attorney James H. Chalat added to party Michael F Hart(pty:pla), filed by Michael F Hart, Kathy Hart. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet , #2 Summons)(Chalat, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hart et al v. Blume
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael F Hart
Represented By: James H. Chalat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathy Hart
Represented By: James H. Chalat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Hart
Represented By: James H. Chalat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Omer Blume
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?