Mahoney et al v. Centura Health Corporation
Plaintiff: M.D. Barbara Morris, Cornelius D Mahoney and Barbara Morris
Defendant: Centura Health Corporation
Case Number: 1:2019cv02478
Filed: August 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Lewis T Babcock
Nature of Suit: Constitutionality of State Statutes
Cause of Action: 28:1331dj
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 4, 2019 Filing 19 CERTIFICATE of Mailing/Service re #18 Order (angar, )
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER. Plaintiffs' Motion for Remand for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction and Request for Expedited Ruling [Doc #8 ] is GRANTED, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 10/4/2019. (angar, )
October 3, 2019 Filing 17 COURTROOM MINUTES for Motion Hearing held before Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 10/3/2019. Granting #8 Plaintiffs' Motion for Remand for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction and Request for Expedited Ruling. Court will incorporate its ruling in a written order. Court Reporter: Julie Thomas. (ebuch)
October 1, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Felipe S. Bohnet-Gomez on behalf of Barbara MorrisAttorney Felipe S. Bohnet-Gomez added to party Barbara Morris(pty:pla) (Bohnet-Gomez, Felipe)
September 30, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Matthew J. Cron on behalf of Barbara MorrisAttorney Matthew J. Cron added to party Barbara Morris(pty:pla) (Cron, Matthew)
September 27, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE OF CONSTITUTIONAL CHALLENGE TO THE COLORADO END OF LIFE OPTIONS ACT by Defendant Centura Health Corporation (Sabey, Melvin)
September 26, 2019 Filing 13 RESPONSE to #8 MOTION to Remand to State Court For Lack Of Subject Matter Jurisdiction And Request For Expedited Ruling filed by Defendant Centura Health Corporation. (Sabey, Melvin)
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER granting #11 Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Motion to Dismiss Until After the Court Resolves Plaintiffs' Motion for Remand, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 9/17/2019. (ebuch)
September 16, 2019 Filing 11 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #9 MOTION to Dismiss Until After the Court Resolves Plaintiffs' Motion for Remand by Plaintiffs Cornelius D Mahoney, Barbara Morris. (Wienczkowski, Steven)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER: Defendant shall respond to #8 Motion for Remand for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction and Request for Expedited Ruling on or before 9/26/2019. Motion Hearing set for 10/3/2019 09:00 AM in Courtroom C401 before Judge Lewis T. Babcock, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 9/12/2019. (ebuch)
September 11, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant Centura Health Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C)(Sabey, Melvin)
September 11, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Plaintiffs Cornelius D Mahoney, Barbara Morris. (Spitalnick, Jason)
August 30, 2019 Filing 7 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (cmadr, )
August 30, 2019 Filing 6 Case assigned to Judge Lewis T. Babcock and drawn to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. Text Only Entry (cmadr, )
August 30, 2019 Filing 5 COMPLAINT for Declaratory Relief against Centura Health Corporation, filed by Barbara Morris, Cornelius D Mahoney.(cmadr, )
August 30, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Jason Maxwell Spitalnick on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Jason Maxwell Spitalnick added to party Cornelius D Mahoney(pty:pla), Attorney Jason Maxwell Spitalnick added to party Barbara Morris(pty:pla) (Spitalnick, Jason)
August 30, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Steven J. Wienczkowski on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Steven J. Wienczkowski added to party Cornelius D Mahoney(pty:pla), Attorney Steven J. Wienczkowski added to party Barbara Morris(pty:pla) (Wienczkowski, Steven)
August 30, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE re #1 Notice of Removal, Civil Cover Sheet by Defendant Centura Health Corporation (Sabey, Melvin)
August 30, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Centura Health Corporation from District Court, Arapahoe County, Case Number 2019CV031980. (Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number 1082-6871765), filed by Centura Health Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Summons & Complaint, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D - Register of Actions)(Sabey, Melvin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mahoney et al v. Centura Health Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Centura Health Corporation
Represented By: Melvin B. Sabey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M.D. Barbara Morris
Represented By: Steven J. Wienczkowski
Represented By: Jason Maxwell Spitalnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cornelius D Mahoney
Represented By: Steven J. Wienczkowski
Represented By: Jason Maxwell Spitalnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Morris
Represented By: Steven J. Wienczkowski
Represented By: Jason Maxwell Spitalnick
Represented By: Felipe S. Bohnet-Gomez
Represented By: Matthew J. Cron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?