Stross v. Premium Source Inc.
Plaintiff: Alexander Stross
Defendant: Premium Source Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv02496
Filed: August 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Scott T Varholak
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MINUTE ORDER This matter is set for a Scheduling Conference on 12/10/2019 01:30 PM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. The parties shall file the Election Concerning Consent/Non-Consent to United States Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form on or before 11/26/2019, and shall submit a joint proposed scheduling order on or before 12/03/2019. Pursuant to 6 Advisory Notice to Attorney and Court, Counsel for Plaintiff, Richard P. Liebowitz, shall comply with the requirements set forth in the Notice and file a Notice of Appearance on or before 11/26/2019. SO ORDERED, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 10/23/2019. Text Only Entry (stvlc1, )
October 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Pursuant to #9 Affidavit of Service and #11 Defendant's Status Report, #7 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(5) or to Quash Service is DENIED AS MOOT. SO ORDERED, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 10/23/2019. Text Only Entry(stvlc1, )
October 23, 2019 Filing 11 STATUS REPORT by Defendant Premium Source Inc.. (Bernstein, Howard)
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER On or before 10/28/2019, Defendant shall file a Status Report notifying the Court of its position regarding whether #7 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(5) or to Quash Service has been mooted by Plaintiff's filing of #9 Affidavit of Service. SO ORDERED, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 10/21/2019. Text Only Entry (stvlc1, )
October 20, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Alexander Stross. Premium Source Inc. served on 10/19/2019, answer due 11/12/2019. (Liebowitz, Richard)
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER In light of the filing of #7 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(5) or to Quash Service (the "Motion"), the Scheduling Conference set for 11/4/2019 10:30 AM, and associated deadlines, are VACATED to be reset, if necessary, after a ruling on the Motion. SO ORDERED, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 10/15/2019. Text Only Entry (stvlc1, )
October 14, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Quash Service, or to Dismiss, by Defendant Premium Source Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Motion to Dismiss or to Quash Service, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B to Motion to Dismiss or to Quash Service, #3 Proposed Order (PDF Only) Proposed Order Granting Motion to Dismiss or to Quash Service)(Bernstein, Howard)
October 11, 2019 Filing 6 ADVISORY NOTICE TO ATTORNEY AND COURT: Under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3(a), RICHARD LIEBOWITZ was administratively removed from the court's attorney roll and barred from filing electronically under CM/ECF for failing to pay the 2018 Biennial Fee. Counsel must complete a Bar/ECF application through counsel's Attorney Services Portal account and pay the full application fee to be restored to the attorney roll and CM/ECF. Upon reinstatement, counsel must file a Notice of Entry of Appearance in this case. (Text Only Entry) (mfred)
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 11/4/2019 10:30 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Consent Form due by 10/21/2019. Proposed Scheduling Order due 10/28/2019, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 9/4/2019. (jgonz, )
September 3, 2019 Filing 4 Report re Copyright: Report on the filing of an action emailed separately to the Director of the Copyright Office. (agarc, )
September 3, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (agarc, )
August 30, 2019 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Text Only Entry. (agarc, )
August 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Premium Source Inc. (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6873339)Attorney Richard Liebowitz added to party Alexander Stross(pty:pla), filed by Alexander Stross. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Summons, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Copyright Form)(Liebowitz, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stross v. Premium Source Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Premium Source Inc.
Represented By: Elise Margaret Aiken
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexander Stross
Represented By: Richard Liebowitz
Represented By: Richard P. Liebowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?