Mena v. Costco Wholesale Corporation
Plaintiff: Christine Mena
Defendant: Costco Wholesale Corporation
Case Number: 1:2019cv02531
Filed: September 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Lewis T Babcock
Referring Judge: N Reid Neureiter
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 10/2/2019. Scheduling Conference set for 12/4/2019 11:00 AM in Courtroom C203 before Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. (tsher, )
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 10/1/2019. (ebuch)
September 17, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Submission of Register of Actions by Defendant Costco Wholesale Corporation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Register of Actions)(Merpi, Richard)
September 16, 2019 Filing 9 AMENDED ANSWER to First Amended Answer and Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand by Defendant Costco Wholesale Corporation. (McCune, Daniel)
September 9, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Alessandra Teresa Morales on behalf of Christine MenaAttorney Alessandra Teresa Morales added to party Christine Mena(pty:pla) (Morales, Alessandra)
September 9, 2019 Filing 7 Costco Wholesale Corporation's ANSWER to #4 Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Costco Wholesale Corporation.(McCune, Daniel)
September 6, 2019 Filing 6 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (rvill, )
September 5, 2019 Filing 5 Case assigned to Judge Lewis T. Babcock and drawn to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. Text Only Entry. (rvill, )
September 5, 2019 Filing 4 CIVIL COMPLAINT against Costco Wholesale Corporation, filed by Christine Mena.(rvill, )
September 5, 2019 Filing 3 FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawls of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (Text Only Entry) (rvill, )
September 5, 2019 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (McCune, Daniel)
September 5, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Costco Wholesale Corporation from Arapahoe County District Court, Case Number 2019CV31933. (Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number 1082-6879806), filed by Costco Wholesale Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Complaint, #3 Exhibit B - Civil Case Cover Sheet, #4 Exhibit C - Order Granting Stipulation of Dismissal Without Prejudice of Defendant Price Company)(Merpi, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mena v. Costco Wholesale Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christine Mena
Represented By: Alessandra Teresa Morales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Costco Wholesale Corporation
Represented By: Daniel Ray McCune
Represented By: Richard L. Merpi, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?