Kaufman v. Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Christopher Kaufman
Defendant: Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv02568
Filed: September 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Michael E Hegarty
Referring Judge: William J Martinez
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 11/8/2019. (tsher, )
November 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MINUTE ORDER granting in part and denying in part #22 Motion for Protective Order, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 11/7/2019.(tsher, )
November 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MEMORANDUM regarding #22 Joint MOTION for Protective Order filed by Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty by Judge William J. Martinez on 11/7/2019. Text Only Entry (wjmsec, )
November 5, 2019 Filing 22 Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Defendant Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Protective Order)(Blonigen, Evan)
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 10/18/2019. (tsher, )
October 17, 2019 Filing 20 COURTROOM MINUTES ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty: Scheduling Conference held on 10/17/2019. Discovery Deadline: June 30, 2020. Dispositive Motion Deadline: July 30, 2020. Initial Rule 26(a)(2) Disclosures: April 30, 2020. Rebuttal Rule 26(a)(2) Disclosures: May 29, 2020. Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/10/2020 at 10:15 AM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. FTR: A501. (cthom, )
October 8, 2019 Filing 19 Proposed Scheduling Order by Defendant Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company. (Blonigen, Evan)
October 4, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Terence M. Ridley on behalf of Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance CompanyAttorney Terence M. Ridley added to party Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company(pty:dft) (Ridley, Terence)
September 24, 2019 Filing 17 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendant Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company All parties do not consent.. (Blonigen, Evan)
September 18, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Filing of State Court Docket and State Court Order by Defendant Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Docket Sheet State Court Docket Sheet, #2 Exhibit State Court Order dated 9-11-19)(Blonigen, Evan)
September 16, 2019 Filing 15 ANSWER to #3 Complaint Plaintiff's Complaint for Damages and Jury Demand by Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company.(Blonigen, Evan)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 9/13/19. Scheduling Conference set for 10/17/2019 11:45 AM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Proposed Scheduling Order due by 9/27/19. (nmarb, )
September 13, 2019 Filing 13 CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #12 Order of Recusal. This case is randomly reassigned to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. All future pleadings should be designated as 19-cv-02568-WJM-MEH. (Text Only Entry) (tsher, )
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER OF RECUSAL by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 9/13/2019. The Clerk of the Court shall cause this case to be reassigned to another Magistrate Judge. (tsher, )
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: Counsel for the parties and all counsel who may later enter an appearance shall review and familiarize themselves with the undersigned's Revised Practice Standards (as most recently revised effective December 1, 2018 and as they may be amended from time to time), which may be downloaded #here. SO ORDERED by Judge William J. Martinez on 9/ 13/2019. Text Only Entry (wjmsec, )
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. Magistrate Judge Neureiter, or such other Magistrate Judge who may in the future be reassigned this case, is designated to conduct NDISPO proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 72(a) and (b). Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the Magistrate Judge or on the request of the parties by motion, the court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. SO ORDERED by Judge William J. Martinez on 9/13/2019. Text Only Entry (wjmsec, )
September 12, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Sean Bradley Leventhal on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Sean Bradley Leventhal added to party Christopher Kaufman(pty:pla) (Leventhal, Sean)
September 12, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Jonathan Shawn Sar on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Jonathan Shawn Sar added to party Christopher Kaufman(pty:pla) (Sar, Jonathan)
September 11, 2019 Filing 7 ERRATA re #1 Notice of Removal,, Corrected Exhibit C by Defendant Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Errata - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal - 09-11-19)(Logan, Cedric)
September 10, 2019 Filing 6 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (cmadr, )
September 10, 2019 Filing 5 Case assigned to Judge William J. Martinez and drawn to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. Text Only Entry. (cmadr, )
September 10, 2019 Filing 4 RETURN of Service of Summons, Complaint upon Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company on 12 August, 2019 (cmadr, )
September 10, 2019 Filing 3 COMPLAINT for Damages and Jury Demand against Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company, filed by Christopher Kaufman.(cmadr, )
September 10, 2019 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Allstate Insurance Holdings, LLC, Corporate Parent The Allstate Corporation, Corporate Parent Allstate Insurance Company for Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company. (Blonigen, Evan)
September 10, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company from Adams County District Court, Brighton, CO, Case Number 2019CV31173. (Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number 1082-6886700), filed by Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Insurer Producer Index Inquiry, #2 Exhibit B-EcoShield Estimate, #3 Exhibit C-Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #4 State Court - Summons, #5 State Court - Complaint for Damages and Jury Demand, #6 State Court - District Court Cover Sheet, #7 State Court - Return of Service, #8 Civil Cover Sheet)(Logan, Cedric)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kaufman v. Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Kaufman
Represented By: Jonathan Shawn Sar
Represented By: Sean Bradley Leventhal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company
Represented By: Cedric Dwight Logan
Represented By: Evan Michael Blonigen
Represented By: Terence M. Ridley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?