Motto Franchising, LLC v. Perona et al
Plaintiff: Motto Franchising, LLC
Defendant: Gustavo Perona and King Lending, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv02574
Filed: September 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Daniel D Domenico
Referring Judge: Michael E Hegarty
Nature of Suit: Contract: Franchise
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER. In light of Plaintiff's #8 Notice of Settlement and Unopposed Motion to Vacate Scheduling Conference, dismissal papers shall be filed on or before December 2, 2019. The Scheduling Conference set for November 19, 2019 is hereby vacated. By Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 11/01/2019. Text Only Entry (dddlc2)
November 1, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Settlement and Unopposed Motion to Vacate Scheduling Conference by Plaintiff Motto Franchising, LLC (Wasserman, Emily)
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 9/17/2019. Scheduling Conference is VACATED and RESET to 11/19/2019 01:45 PM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. (tsher, )
September 12, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Emily Lauren Wasserman on behalf of Motto Franchising, LLCAttorney Emily Lauren Wasserman added to party Motto Franchising, LLC(pty:pla) (Wasserman, Emily)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER Pursuant to the Order of Reference, it is hereby ORDERED that the Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) Scheduling Conference shall be held on November 5, 2019, at 10:15 a.m. in Courtroom A-501, on the fifth floor of the Alfred A. Arraj United States Courthouse located at 901 19th Street, Denver, Colorado. ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 9/12/2019. (cthom, )
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Hegarty. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of Local Civ. R. 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, (4) conduct hearings, including evidentiary hearings, and submit proposed findings of fact and recommendations for rulings on dispositive motions, and (5) pursuant to Local Civ. R. 16.6 and at the discretion of the Magistrate Judge, convene such early neutral evaluation and/or settlement conferences and direct related procedures as may facilitate resolution of this case without the necessity of a motion or prior authorization of the undersigned. SO ORDERED by Judge Daniel D. Domenico on September 12, 2019. Text Only Entry (dddlc2)
September 11, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (rvill, )
September 10, 2019 Filing 2 Case assigned to Judge Daniel D. Domenico and drawn to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Text Only Entry. (rvill, )
September 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6887372)Attorney Jacqueline Ventre Roeder added to party Motto Franchising, LLC(pty:pla), filed by Motto Franchising, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(Roeder, Jacqueline)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Motto Franchising, LLC v. Perona et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Motto Franchising, LLC
Represented By: Jacqueline Ventre Roeder
Represented By: Emily Lauren Wasserman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gustavo Perona
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: King Lending, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?