United States Securities and Exchange Commission v. Mediatrix Capital Inc. et al
Plaintiff: United States Securities and Exchange Commission
Defendant: DCC Islands Foundation, Mediatrix Capital PR LLC, Hanna Ohonkova Sewall, TF Alliance, LLC, Victoria M. Stewart, Michael C. Baker, Bryant E. Sewall, Mediatrix Capital Fund Ltd., Island Technologies LLC, Mediatrix Capital, LLC, Blue Isle Markets Ltd., Mediatrix Capital Inc., Blue Isle Markets Inc., Casa Conejo LLC, 1989 Foundation, The, Hase Haus, LLC, West Beach LLC, Arual LP, Walter C. Young, III, Weinzel, LLC, Michael S. Stewart, Maria C. Young, Michael S. Young, Salve Regina Trust and Keystone Business Trust
Interested Party: Equiti Armenia CJSC and Equiti Capital UK Limited
Case Number: 1:2019cv02594
Filed: September 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Raymond P Moore
Nature of Suit: Securities, Commodities, Exchange
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 77
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 18, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 47 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #1 Complaint,, by Defendant Arual LP. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Krysa, Thomas)
October 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 46 Unopposed MOTION for Discovery Motion for Expedited Third Party Discovery by Plaintiff United States Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Williams, Mark)
October 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 45 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Tamera Dietrich Westerberg on behalf of Walter C. Young, IIIAttorney Tamera Dietrich Westerberg added to party Walter C. Young, III(pty:dft) (Westerberg, Tamera)
October 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 44 RESPONSE to #41 MOTION for Order to Brokers To Close Positions Attorney Douglas W. Henkin added to party Equiti Armenia CJSC(pty:ip), Attorney Douglas W. Henkin added to party Equiti Capital UK Limited(pty:ip) filed by Interested Parties Equiti Armenia CJSC, Equiti Capital UK Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to Response to Motion, #2 Exhibit 2 to Response to Motion, #3 Exhibit 3 to Response to Motion, #4 Exhibit 4 to Response to Motion, #5 Exhibit 5 to Response to Motion, #6 Exhibit 6 to Response to Motion, #7 Exhibit 7 to Response to Motion, #8 Exhibit 8 to Response to Motion)(Henkin, Douglas)
October 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 43 NOTICE re #41 MOTION for Order to Brokers To Close Positions Notice Without Consent to Personal Jurisdiction by miscellaneous Equiti Armenia CJSC, Equiti Capital UK Limited (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Nohe-Braun, Britton)
October 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 42 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance (Special Appearance) by Britton Charlotte Nohe-Braun on behalf of Equiti Capital UK Limited, Equiti Armenia CJSCAttorney Britton Charlotte Nohe-Braun added to party Equiti Capital UK Limited(pty:misc), Attorney Britton Charlotte Nohe-Braun added to party Equiti Armenia CJSC(pty:misc) (Nohe-Braun, Britton)
October 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 41 MOTION for Order to Brokers To Close Positions by Defendants Blue Isle Markets Inc., Blue Isle Markets Ltd., Mediatrix Capital Inc., Bryant E. Sewall, Michael S. Stewart, Michael S. Young. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Liquidation Order, #2 Exhibit Email)(Drohan, Vivian)
October 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER Granting #39 Second Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time for Relief Defendant Arual LP to Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint and Jury Demand. By Judge Raymond P. Moore on 10/24/2019. (rvill, )
October 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 39 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #1 Complaint,, by Defendant Arual LP. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Krysa, Thomas)
October 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 38 Stipulation and Order Granting an Asset Freeze, Preliminary Injunction, and Other Relief. By Judge Raymond P. Moore on 10/23/2019.(rvill, )
October 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 37 Unopposed MOTION to Vacate #35 Order AND STIPULATION GRANTING AN ASSET FREEZE, PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION, AND OTHER RELIEF ENTERED ON OCTOBER 10, 2019, AND REPLACE IT WITH THE STIPULATION AND ORDER FILED HEREWITH by Plaintiff United States Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(McKenna, Stephen)
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 36 MINUTE ORDER: In light of the Stipulation and Order Granting an Asset Freeze, Preliminary Injunction and Other Relief #35 , the Show Cause Hearing set for 10/15/2019 is VACATED. SO ORDERED by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 10/10/2019. (Text Only Entry) (rmsec )
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 35 Stipulation and Order Granting #34 an Asset Freeze, Preliminary Injunction, and Other Relief. By Judge Raymond P. Moore on 10/10/2019. (rvill, )
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 34 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER by Plaintiff United States Securities and Exchange Commission. (McKenna, Stephen)
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 33 Order Granting #32 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time For Relief Defendant Arual LP to Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint and Jury Demand, by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 10/08/2019.(rvill, )
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #1 Complaint,, by Defendant Arual LP. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Krysa, Thomas)
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Vivian Rivera Drohan on behalf of Blue Isle Markets Inc.((Cayman Islands)), Blue Isle Markets Ltd., Mediatrix Capital Inc., Bryant E. Sewall, Michael S. Stewart, Michael S. YoungAttorney Vivian Rivera Drohan added to party Blue Isle Markets Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Vivian Rivera Drohan added to party Blue Isle Markets Ltd.(pty:dft), Attorney Vivian Rivera Drohan added to party Mediatrix Capital Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Vivian Rivera Drohan added to party Bryant E. Sewall(pty:dft), Attorney Vivian Rivera Drohan added to party Michael S. Stewart(pty:dft), Attorney Vivian Rivera Drohan added to party Michael S. Young(pty:dft) (Drohan, Vivian)
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting #27 Motion for Order. SO ORDERED by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 10/2/2019. (Text Only Entry)(rmsec )
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER denying, without prejudice. #25 Motion for Protective Order. SO ORDERED by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 10/2/2019. (Text Only Entry)(rmsec )
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 NOTICE of Filing of Accountings by Defendants Blue Isle Markets Inc., Blue Isle Markets Ltd., Mediatrix Capital Inc., Bryant E. Sewall, Hanna Ohonkova Sewall, Michael S. Stewart, Victoria M. Stewart, Maria C. Young, Michael S. Young (Attachments: #1 Appendix Accounting for Bryant & Hannah Sewall, #2 Appendix Accounting for M. & V. Stewart, #3 Appendix Accounting for Mediatrix Capital Inc., #4 Appendix Accounting for Michael & Maria Young, #5 Appendix Accounting for Blue Isle Markets, Inc.)(Thomas, Jeffrey)
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 Unopposed MOTION for Order to Permit Brokers to Close Positions by Defendants Blue Isle Markets Inc., Blue Isle Markets Ltd., Mediatrix Capital Inc., Bryant E. Sewall, Michael S. Stewart, Michael S. Young. (Thomas, Jeffrey)
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 MEMORANDUM regarding #25 Emergency MOTION for Protective Order filed by Bryant E. Sewall, Michael S. Stewart, Michael S. Young. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Raymond P. Moore. Entered by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 10/2/2019. (Text Only Entry) (rmsec )
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Motion No Longer Referred re: #25 Emergency MOTION for Protective Order by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 10/02/2019. Text Only Entry. (rvill, )
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 Emergency MOTION for Protective Order by Defendants Bryant E. Sewall, Michael S. Stewart, Michael S. Young. (Thomas, Jeffrey)
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 DECLARATION of Walter C. Young, III (And Accounting) by Plaintiff United States Securities and Exchange Commission. (McKenna, Stephen)
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 NOTICE of Filing of Accounting for Arual LP by Defendant Arual LP (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Eric Olsen)(Krysa, Thomas)
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #21 Motion for Extension of Time to File. SO ORDERED by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 9/26/2019. (Text Only Entry)(rmsec )
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File and Serve Sworn Accountings by Defendants Blue Isle Markets Inc., Blue Isle Markets Ltd., Mediatrix Capital Inc., Bryant E. Sewall, Hanna Ohonkova Sewall, Michael S. Stewart, Victoria M. Stewart, Maria C. Young, Michael S. Young. (Thomas, Jeffrey)
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 DECLARATION of Michael C. Baker (and Accounting) regarding Order on Motion for Leave,,,, Order on Motion for Leave to Restrict,,,, Order on Motion for TRO,,, #10 by Plaintiff United States Securities and Exchange Commission. (McKenna, Stephen)
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #18 Motion to Continue. The Preliminary Injunction Hearing is RESET for 10/15/2019 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom A 601 before Judge Raymond P. Moore. Deadline to file opposing papers is extended to 10/8/2019 at 12:00 PM. SO ORDERED by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 9/25/2019. (Text Only Entry)(rmsec)
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Unopposed MOTION to Continue Hearing and Extend Time to File Opposing Papers by Defendants Blue Isle Markets Inc., Blue Isle Markets Ltd., Mediatrix Capital Inc., Bryant E. Sewall, Hanna Ohonkova Sewall, Michael S. Stewart, Victoria M. Stewart, Maria C. Young, Michael S. Young. (Thomas, Jeffrey)
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER: The Court has considered the Motion to Continue #15 the preliminary injunction hearing to October 11, 2019. The motion for continuance to that date is DENIED. SO ORDERED by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 9/24/2019. (Text Only Entry) (rmlc1)
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Mark L. Williams on behalf of United States Securities and Exchange CommissionAttorney Mark L. Williams added to party United States Securities and Exchange Commission(pty:pla) (Williams, Mark)
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MOTION to Continue Hearing and Extend Time to File Opposing Papers by Defendants Blue Isle Markets Inc., Blue Isle Markets Ltd., Mediatrix Capital Inc., Bryant E. Sewall, Hanna Ohonkova Sewall, Michael S. Stewart, Victoria M. Stewart, Maria C. Young, Michael S. Young. (Thomas, Jeffrey)
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #11 Motion to Unrestrict Case. SO ORDERED by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 9/18/2019. (Text Only Entry)(rmsec )
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (evana, )
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Defendants Mediatrix Capital Inc., Blue Isle Markets Inc., Blue Isle Markets Ltd., Michael S. Young, Michael S. Stewart, and Bryant E. Sewall; and Relief Defendants Mediatrix Capital Fund Ltd., Island Technologies LLC, Victoria M. Stewart, Maria C. Young, and Hanna Ohonkova Sewall, Michael C. Baker, Walter C. Young III, Arual LP, West Beach LLC, Salve Regina Trust, TF Alliance, LLC, Casa Conejo LLC, Hase Haus, LLC, DCC Islands Foundation, Keystone Business Trust, Weinzel, LLC, The 1989 Foundation, Mediatrix Capital PR LLC, Mediatrix Capital, LLC, Blue Isle Markets Inc. (Cayman Islands) by Plaintiff United States Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons, #11 Summons, #12 Summons, #13 Summons, #14 Summons, #15 Summons, #16 Summons, #17 Summons, #18 Summons, #19 Summons, #20 Summons, #21 Summons, #22 Summons, #23 Summons, #24 Summons, #25 Summons)(McKenna, Stephen)
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MOTION to Unrestrict Case by Plaintiff United States Securities and Exchange Commission. (McKenna, Stephen)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER that Defendants appear before this Court in Courtroom A601 of the United States District Court for the District of Colorado, located at 901 19th Street, Denver, Colorado, at 9 a.m. on the 27th day of September, 2019, for a hearing at which Plaintiff will seek a preliminary injunction extending the asset freeze and other ancillary relief entered in this Order until final adjudication of this case on the merits. That Plaintiff's Emergency Motion for an Ex Parte Order to File Under Seal the Complaint and All Papers Filed Therewith Pending Disposition of Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Implementation of Asset Freeze is GRANTED. That all documents filed in this matter are SEALED., by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 9/13/2019.(evana, )
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STATEMENT re #4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Plaintiff United States Securities and Exchange Commission. (McKenna, Stephen)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 COURTROOM MINUTES for proceedings held before Judge Raymond P. Moore: Motion Hearing held on 9/12/2019, taking under advisement #3 Motion for Leave and #4 Motion for TRO. Court Reporter: Tammy Hoffschildt. (cpear, )
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE by Judge Robert E. Blackburn. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Raymond P. Moore for all further proceedings. All future pleadings should be designated as 19-cv-02594-RM. (sphil, )
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (rvill, )
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Declaration of Jeffrey D. Felder in Support of #4 Plaintiffs Emergency Motion for an Ex Parte Asset Freeze, Temporary Restraining Order, Order to Show Cause, and other Emergency Relief. (rvill, )
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Plaintiff's Emergency Motion for an Ex Parte Asset Freeze, Temporary Restraining Order, Order to Show Cause, and other Emergency Relief by Plaintiff United States Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Information for Temporary Restraining Order, #2 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(rvill, )
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Plaintiffs Emergency Motion for an Ex Parte Order to File Under Seal the Complaint and all Papers Filed therewith pending Disposition of Plaintiffs Emergency Motion for an Ex Parte Asset Freeze, Temporary Restraining Order, and other Emergency Relief, and Implementation of Asset Freeze, by Plaintiff United States Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(rvill, )
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Case assigned to Judge Robert E. Blackburn and drawn to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. Text Only Entry. (rvill, )
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against Defendants, filed by United States Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16, #18 Exhibit 17, #19 Exhibit 18, #20 Exhibit 19, #21 Exhibit 20, #22 Exhibit 21, #23 Exhibit 22, #24 Exhibit 23, #25 Exhibit 24, #26 Exhibit 25, #27 Exhibit 26, #28 Exhibit 27, #29 Exhibit 28, #30 Exhibit 29, #31 Exhibit 30)(rvill, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States Securities and Exchange Commission v. Mediatrix Capital Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DCC Islands Foundation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mediatrix Capital PR LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hanna Ohonkova Sewall
Represented By: Jeffrey Robert Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TF Alliance, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Victoria M. Stewart
Represented By: Jeffrey Robert Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael C. Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bryant E. Sewall
Represented By: Jeffrey Robert Thomas
Represented By: Vivian Rivera Drohan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mediatrix Capital Fund Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Island Technologies LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mediatrix Capital, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blue Isle Markets Ltd.
Represented By: Jeffrey Robert Thomas
Represented By: Vivian Rivera Drohan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mediatrix Capital Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey Robert Thomas
Represented By: Vivian Rivera Drohan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blue Isle Markets Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey Robert Thomas
Represented By: Vivian Rivera Drohan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Casa Conejo LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 1989 Foundation, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hase Haus, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: West Beach LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arual LP
Represented By: Thomas Joseph Krysa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walter C. Young, III
Represented By: Tamera Dietrich Westerberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Weinzel, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael S. Stewart
Represented By: Jeffrey Robert Thomas
Represented By: Vivian Rivera Drohan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maria C. Young
Represented By: Jeffrey Robert Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael S. Young
Represented By: Jeffrey Robert Thomas
Represented By: Vivian Rivera Drohan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Salve Regina Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keystone Business Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States Securities and Exchange Commission
Represented By: Stephen C. McKenna
Represented By: Mark L. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Equiti Armenia CJSC
Represented By: Douglas W. Henkin
Represented By: Britton Charlotte Nohe-Braun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Equiti Capital UK Limited
Represented By: Douglas W. Henkin
Represented By: Britton Charlotte Nohe-Braun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?